Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Elizabeth M Timothy
Case #: 3:19-cv-03552
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 22, 2020 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ANDY ANDRAKOWICZ
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
DANIEL BOONE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL BUTLER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
FREDDIE CORPREW
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL GORDON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE HAUSAM
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RAYMOND LOGAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID MOORE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRAVIS PEPPER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JUAN RIOS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE SEDARAMOS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON THIBEAUX
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER YOCUM
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM YOUNG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RICARDO ZAMORA-VITUNA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
MICHELE MARIE VERCOSKI
Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp - Irvine Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Monday, December 23, 2019
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/23 3:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by ANDY ANDRAKOWICZ. (VERCOSKI, MICHELE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/12 8:48 AM
ORDER Re: Duplicate Cases. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the second-filed case, Case No. 3:19cv3841 Plaintiff Andy Andrakowicz is directed to file his Short Form Complaint in the first-filed case, Case No. 3:19cv3552 All future pleadings and papers must be filed on the docket for the first-filed case. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the docket for each of the above-captioned cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/12/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 11/21 2:34 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:3 Order, (the first-named Plaintiff short-form/amended complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
3 3 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/16 12:35 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. FREDDIE CORPREW, DANIEL GORDON, KYLE HAUSAM, RAYMOND LOGAN, DAVID MOORE, TRAVIS PEPPER, JUAN RIOS, JOSE SEDARAMOS, JASON THIBEAUX, CHRISTOPHER YOCUM, WILLIAM YOUNG, RICARDO ZAMORA-VITUNA, DANIEL BOONE and MICHAEL BUTLER terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Fri 09/27 12:55 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action Related [+]. (djb)
Related: [-] vised 6/12
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4631282.), filed by JOSE SEDARAMOS, RAYMOND LOGAN, DANIEL BOONE, ANDY ANDRAKOWICZ, CHRISTOPHER YOCUM, KYLE HAUSAM, MICHAEL BUTLER, TRAVIS PEPPER, JASON THIBEAUX, WILLIAM YOUNG, RICARDO ZAMORA-VITUNA, DAVID MOORE, FREDDIE CORPREW, JUAN RIOS, DANIEL GORDON. (VERCOSKI, MICHELE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Affidavit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/25 11:20 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]