Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:19-cv-02281
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2019
Re-opened:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 23, 2020 5:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Match Group Inc
Represented By
Angela C Zambrano
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Anna Tutundjian
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Chad S Hummel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
David Y Sillers
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Federal Trade Commission
Represented By
Matthew James Wilshire
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
M Hasan Aijaz
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Zachary Alexander Keller
Federal Trade Commission
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Before the Court are: (1) Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss ("Motion to Dismiss") (Doc. No. 20); (2) Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Exclude Matters Outside the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(d) ("Motion to Exclude") (Doc. No. 26); and (3) Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply ("Motion for Leave") (Doc. No. 32). The Court has carefully considered each of the motions, the responses, the replies, the supporting appendices, the applicable law, and the relevant portions of the record. The Court grants Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss as to the claim for equitable monetary relief in Counts I-IV. The Court also grants Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II because Match is entitled to immunity under 47 U.S.C. § 230 of the Communications Decency Act, thus those claims are barred and dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss is denied in all other respects. The Court denies Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Exclude. The Court also denies Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply.The Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2022) (chmb)
Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
333 333 respm Response/Objection Mon 05/19 11:35 PM
RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC re:322 Designation of Deposition,315 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
332 332 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Mon 05/19 5:34 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Federal Trade Commission. (Moon, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
331 331 respm Reply Fri 05/16 3:42 PM
REPLY filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC re:309 MOTION for Leave to take Trial Deposition of Amanda Ginsberg and for Expedited Briefing (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
330 330 order Order Wed 05/14 3:23 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Doc. No. 315). Plaintiff seeks leave to file under seal its exhibit list (Doc. No. 315-2), witness list (Doc. No. 315-3), proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law (Doc. No. 315-4), and trial brief (Doc. No. 315-5). Based on assertions in its Motion, Plaintiff does not have the interest in sealing these documents. Further, Defendants were unable to indicate whether they are opposed to this relief without having reviewed the documents at issue. Accordingly, by May 21, 2025 , Defendants shall file a notice with the Court specifying (1) the documents/information that they will NOT seek to redact or seal (if any) and (2) those that they will request to be redacted or filed under seal (if any). For any documents/information they wish to redact or seal, Defendants shall file, by May 28, 2025 , a sealing brief in support of their request. See Doc. No. 216 (previous order outlining the sealing standard and this Court's specific briefing requirements). If Defendants fail to file the required sealing brief, the Court will construe their silence as consent to the unsealing of all documents covered by this Motion. The Court will allow the documents filed at Doc. Nos. 315-2, 315-3, 315-4, and 315-5 to remain temporarily under seal pending the Court's ruling on this Motion. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/14/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
329 329 order Order Wed 05/14 1:01 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having reviewed Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take Trial Deposition of Amanda Ginsberg (Doc. No. 309) and Plaintiff's Response thereto (Doc. No. 311), the Court ORDERS Defendants to file a reply by May 16, 2025. In their reply, Defendants shall address Plaintiff's arguments, including whether Amanda Ginsberg is subject to the Court's compulsory process for trial, why her anticipated testimony is not duplicative and cumulative of other witnesses, and why she cannot testify in-person after her return from Uganda on June 13, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/14/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
328 328 trial Trial Brief Mon 05/12 9:50 PM
TRIAL BRIEF by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
327 327 motion In Limine Mon 05/12 9:49 PM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Witnesses Not Previously Disclosed and Cumulative Testimony filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
326 326 motion In Limine Mon 05/12 9:47 PM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Lacking Foundation filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
325 325 motion In Limine Mon 05/12 9:45 PM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Claims Dismissed with Prejudice filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
324 324 motion In Limine Mon 05/12 9:43 PM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Customer Complaints filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
323 323 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Mon 05/12 9:42 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
322 322 trial Designation of Deposition Mon 05/12 9:41 PM
Designation of Deposition by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
321 321 trial Designation of Deposition Mon 05/12 9:39 PM
Designation of Deposition by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
320 320 trial Exhibit List Mon 05/12 9:32 PM
Exhibit List by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
319 319 trial Witness List Mon 05/12 9:30 PM
Witness List by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
Related: [-]
318 318 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Mon 05/12 8:51 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Federal Trade Commission. (Moon, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Attachment A
317 317 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/12 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Introduce Evidence under FRCP 807 and 902(11) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Moon, Jason)
Related: [-]
316 316 motion In Limine Mon 05/12 5:05 PM
MOTION in Limine to Pre-admit Evidence for Trial filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Chung, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Attachment A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting FTC's Motion in Limine to Pre-admit
315 315 motion Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Mon 05/12 4:48 PM
(Document Restricted) Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Tepfer, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 FTC's Exhibit List,
Att: 3 FTC's Witness List,
Att: 4 FTC's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law,
Att: 5 FTC's Trial Brief
314 314 trial Designation of Deposition Mon 05/12 3:54 PM
Designation of Deposition by Federal Trade Commission. (Conte, Nicole)
Related: [-]
313 313 trial Designation of Deposition Mon 05/12 3:49 PM
Designation of Deposition by Federal Trade Commission. (Conte, Nicole)
Related: [-]
312 312 motion In Limine Mon 05/12 3:27 PM
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Certain Evidence at Trial filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Tepfer, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
311 311 respm Response/Objection Mon 05/12 11:57 AM
RESPONSE filed by Federal Trade Commission re:309 MOTION for Leave to take Trial Deposition of Amanda Ginsberg and for Expedited Briefing (Conte, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defs. Mot.