Municipality of Arroyo, Puerto Rico v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45817 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Puerto Rico, 3:19-cv-01816 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:24 PM EST |
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceutical, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Other Corporations ABC and 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergen Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Municipality of Arroyo Puerto Rico
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/30/2019 11:48 AM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 272 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergen Finance, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., David A. Sackler, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Ilene Sackler-Lefcourt, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Corporations ABC and 1-100, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., PAR Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceutical L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Specgx LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Watson Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6564945.), filed by Municipality of Arroyo Puerto Rico . Service due by 11/27/2019,(Sanders, Douglas) Modified on 8/30/2019 to replace uppercase text (gmm). [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons, | ||
Att: 19 Summons, | ||
Att: 20 Summons, | ||
Att: 21 Summons, | ||
Att: 22 Summons, | ||
Att: 23 Summons, | ||
Att: 24 Summons, | ||
Att: 25 Summons, | ||
Att: 26 Summons, | ||
Att: 27 Summons, | ||
Att: 28 Summons, | ||
Att: 29 Summons, | ||
Att: 30 Summons, | ||
Att: 31 Summons, | ||
Att: 32 Summons, | ||
Att: 33 Summons, | ||
Att: 34 Summons, | ||
Att: 35 Summons, | ||
Att: 36 Summons, | ||
Att: 37 Summons, | ||
Att: 38 Summons, | ||
Att: 39 Summons, | ||
Att: 40 Summons, | ||
Att: 41 Summons, | ||
Att: 42 Summons, | ||
Att: 43 Summons, | ||
Att: 44 Summons, | ||
Att: 45 Summons | ||
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
3 | 3 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergen Finance, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceutical L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler-Lefcourt, Specgx LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (rim) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons in a Civil Action | ||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2804 informing of the electronic transfer to the Northern District of Ohio. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-111 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 9/19/2019. (gmm) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-111) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL # 2804. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols on 9/19/2019. (gmm) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
Att: 1 NEF, | ||
Att: 2 Tag Along | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-111 received from the Northern District of Ohio. (gmm) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.] | |
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Puerto Rico. Case number 3:19-cv-01816. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |