Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Chalfont
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Oki Mollway |
Referred: | Barry M Kurren |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00129 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | CABLE TV CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 4:53 PM HST |
Defendant
Byron E. Chalfont
idividually and d/b/a Honolulu Tavern [email: eat@sirisgourmetburgersandpizza.com] 2813 Beach Blvd.
Gulfport, FL 33707 |
|
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
47 | 47
order
Stipulation for Dismissal and Order
Mon 10/26 3:06 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CLAIMS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/26/2015. This action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and Rule 41(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 41.1. There are no remaining parties, claims and/or issues. (emt, ) |
|
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Mon 10/26 3:08 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of47 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CLAIMS shall be served to Byron E. Chalfont by First Class Mail at the address of record on October 27, 2015. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
46 | 46
minutes
Link
Mon 10/19 9:40 AM
EO: The deadline to submit the Stipulation for Dismissal is extended to 11/2/2015. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
45 | 45
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Mon 10/05 8:59 AM
EO: Per Dan Ikehara, case SETTLED. All dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. A Stipulation for Dismissal is due by 10/19/2015. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
2 - Set Hearings
Tue 09/22 9:09 AM
EO: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2015 at 9:30AM is MOVED to 10:00AM on that same date before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Final Pretrial Conference Statements are due 9/30/2015. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
43 | 43
respm
Memorandum
Fri 08/07 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM of Points in42 Answer to Plaintiff's33 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Byron E. Chalfont, Individually and dba Honolulu Tavern - filed by Byron E. Chalfont.(emt, ) |
|
Att: 1 E-mail from Byron Chalfont dated August 12, 2012, | ||
Att: 2 E-mail from Byron Chalfont dated October 29, 2013, | ||
Att: 3 Letter from Thomas P. Riley, Esq., dated October 7, 2013, | ||
Att: 4 Picture of 60" TV with internet in seating area, | ||
Att: 5 Drawing of the Honolulu Tavern | ||
42 | 42
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/07 11:17 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Plaintiff's Reply Brief re33 - filed by Byron E. Chalfont.(emt, ) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Documentation | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 08/06 3:50 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re33 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/6/2015. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
40 | 40
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/27 8:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re39 Reply to Response to Motion (Ikehara, Dan) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 07/27 8:16 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re33 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Against Defendant Chalfont filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Ikehara, Dan) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
38 | 38
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/23 5:13 PM
SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER; NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 7/23/2015. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/21 1:00 PM
ANSWER to33 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Against Defendant Byron E. Chalfont, Individually and dba Honolulu Tavern - filed by Byron E. Chalfont.(emt, ) |
|
Att: 1 Drawing of Honolulu Tavern | ||
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/22 6:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. upon Defendant Byron E. Chalfont (Ikehara, Dan) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 06/10 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion33 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Against Defendant Chalfont :. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2015 09:00 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
34 | 34
respm
Concise Statement of Facts
Wed 06/10 8:54 AM
CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts of Plaintiff re33 filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Ikehara, Dan) Modified on 6/10/2015 (emt, ) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 06/10 8:49 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Against Defendant Chalfont Dan S. Ikehara appearing for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Ikehara, Dan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 1 - Distributorship Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Rate Card, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Your Bartenders, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Aff. of Investigator w/photos, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Dft's Answers to Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration Declaration of Counsel | ||
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 2 - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 05/01 11:49 AM
EP: Hearing on26 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines and28 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines held. Insofar as there is a conflict in the Court's trial calendar, the Court GRANTS the Motions and CONTINUES trial to 09:00 AM on 11/12/2015 before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. The deadline to file dispositive motions is 6/15/2015. Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures are due by 6/15/2015; Defendant's expert witness disclosures are due by 8/15/2015. Discovery is due by 9/14/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2015 is VACATED and RESET for 10/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Other dates and deadlines appear below. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. (C7F, 10:30-10:40 AM) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 04/20 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on28 and26 Motions to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines is set for 05/01/2015 10:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Any Opposition Memorandum is due 04/27/2015; any Reply Memorandum is due 04/29/2015.(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
misc
Advisory Entry
Thu 04/09 9:17 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number30 Certificate of Service filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that this document does not include the filing party's contact information, pursuant to LR10.2(b) Identification of Person Filing a Document. No further action necessary as to this entry. (emt, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/08 12:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re28 MOTION to Continue Trial Date And Pretrial Deadlines (Ikehara, Dan) |
|
29 | 29
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Wed 04/08 10:25 AM
EO: A hearing on26 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines and28 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines is set for 5/12/2015 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Pro Se Defendant Byron E. Chalfont may request to appear at the hearing by phone by contacting Judge Kurren's Courtroom Manager at 808-541-1306. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Modified on 4/8/2015 (kur1, ) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Continue
Mon 04/06 10:29 AM
MOTION to Continue Trial Date And Pretrial Deadlines Dan S. Ikehara appearing for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Ikehara, Dan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
misc
Advisory Entry
Wed 04/01 8:12 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the image affixed to docket number27 Supplement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., appears to be "Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines", previously filed on March 30, 2015, see docket entry26 . If the filing party had intended to submit documents in support of that motion, these document(s) should be resubmitted. (emt, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Supplement
Tue 03/31 8:03 AM
SUPPLEMENT re26 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. . (Ikehara, Dan) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Mon 03/30 5:05 PM
MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines Dan S. Ikehara appearing for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Ikehara, Dan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Tuesday, March 17, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 03/17 11:06 AM
EP: Settlement Conference held on 3/17/2015. No settlement at this time. (In chambers, no record, 10:30-11:05AM)(MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines
Thu 01/29 2:22 PM
STIPULATION FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS; ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/28/2015. ( The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended from 1/28/2015 to 3/17/2015.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 Letter from the Clerks Office to Byron E. Chalfont, dated October 24, 2014 Re: Return of discovery-type documents. (emt, ) | |
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. First Request for Production of Documents (Ikehara, Dan) | |
21 | 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. First Request for Answers To Interrogatories (Ikehara, Dan) | |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 FIRST AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 8/29/2014. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Byron E. Chalfont shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on September 2, 2014. | |
Tuesday, August 19, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 EO: In light of the17 Answer and Request for Jury Trial, new dates anddeadlines are given as follows. Court to prepare scheduling order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 06/30/2015 at 9:00 a.m. before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference remain set for 05/19/2015 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Settlement Conference remain set for 03/17/2015 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Motions remain due by 01/28/2015. Discovery remain due by 05/1/2015. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry | |
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Byron E. Chalfont (emt, ) | |
17 | 17 "Defendant's Answer to Complaint - SUPPLEMENTAL" -- by Byron E. Chalfont Request for Jury Trial. (emt, ) | |
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - by Byron E. Chalfont (emt, ) | |
15 | 15 ANSWER to1 Complaint; Statement of Defendant - by Byron E. Chalfont.(emt, ) | |
Wednesday, August 06, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 8/6/2014. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Byron E. Chalfont shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on August 7, 2014. | |
Friday, July 25, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Trial dates and deadlines appear below. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. In addition, Defendant shall have until 8/19/2014 to file an Answer to the Complaint. Bench Trial set for 6/30/2015 09:00 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2015 09:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2015 10:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Motions due by 1/28/2015. Discovery due by 5/1/2015. (C7, no record 9:39-9:50AM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 14-00129 SOM-BMK on all further filings . (ecs, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. | |
Thursday, July 17, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant - filed by Bryon E. Chalfont. (ecs, ) | |
Sunday, July 13, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff . (Ikehara, Dan) | |
9 | 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Ikehara, Dan) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dan S. Ikehara on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Ikehara, Dan) | |
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. All Defendants. (Ikehara, Dan) | |
Wednesday, May 28, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2014 is CONTINUED to 7/25/2014 at 9:30AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Scheduling Conference Statements are due 7/18/2014. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry | |
Monday, March 17, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 6/16/2014 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Signed by Judge Susan Mollway on 3/13/2014.(ecs, ) No COS issued for this docket entry | |
Att: 1 Memorandum Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements | ||
Thursday, March 13, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00,receipt number HI011195 re1 Complaint (ecs, ) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re1 Complaint.(ecs, ) | |
Att: 1 Consent: Election Form | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Byron E. Chalfont. (ecs, ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Byron E. Chalfont, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(ecs, ) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |