North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:19-cr-00512
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2019 3:12 AM EDT
Defendant
VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL (1)
Represented By
DAVID B. SMITH
contact info
ALAN DOORASAMY, SR.
Law Office Of Alan Doorasamy, Sr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
RANDALL STUART GALYON
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Mdnc
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/01/2019 3:18 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL (1). (Kemp, Donita) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
2 2 ARREST Warrant Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE in case as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. (Kemp, Donita) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
Arrest of VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL on 9/3/2019. (Garrett, Kim) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD:Initial Appearance as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL held on 9/3/2019. AUSA Kyle Pousson. Proceedings Recorded. (Garrett, Kim) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Oral Motion Re: Detention by USA as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. (Garrett, Kim) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. (Daniel, J) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER appointing CJA Panel Attorney ALAN DOORASAMY, SR. as counsel for VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/3/2019. (Daniel, J) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SCHEDULING DETENTION HEARING/PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION HEARING for 9/10/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Greensboro Courtroom #1A as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/3/2019. (Daniel, J) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
6 6 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 09/03/2019 in case as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. (Coyne, Michelle) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 08, 2019
7 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alan Doorasamy Sr. by VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. (DOORASAMY, ALAN) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
Motions Referred: RE:7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alan Doorasamy Sr., to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. ALAN DOORASAMY, SR. is terminated as counsel of record for VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL. New counsel shall be appointed and the detention and preliminary hearings scheduled for 09/10/2019 are continued to a date to be determined. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/09/2019. (AULD, L.) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
8 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 09/10/2019, that CJA Panel Attorney David B. Smith is directed to provide representation for VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL in this action. (Coyne, Michelle) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
Email notification on 9/11/2019 to USA, USM, USPT and Attorney David Smith re: Detention Hearing/Preliminary Examination set for 9/16/2019 01:30 PM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED Pretrial Service Report. UPON COMPLETION OF THE DETENTION HEARING, ANY PAPER COPIES OF THE PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE PROBATION OFFICE by Plaintiff USA and Defendant VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL as to Victor Hugo Martinez-Carbajal. (Tapp, Beige) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD:PRELIMINARY EXAM (HEARING) AND DETENTION HEARING as to VICTOR HUGO MARTINEZ-CARBAJAL held on 9/16/2019. AUSA Nikki Shaffer. Attorney David Smith present with defendant. Defendant does not contest Probable Cause. Evidence presented. Probable Cause found. Defendant detained. Written order forthcoming. Proceedings recorded. (Garrett, Kim) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
11 11 ORDER Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/20/2019 that probable cause supports the criminal complaint in this case. FURTHER that the oral Motion for Detention by the United States is GRANTED and the defendant shall be detained pending disposition of the instant charges pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3142(e)(1). (Coyne, Michelle) [1:19-mj-00279-JEP]
Related: [-]