PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC v. MOWI ASA et al
Maine District Court | |
Judge: | John A Woodcock, Jr |
Referred: | John H Rich III |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00446 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 29, 2020 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
MARINE HARVEST USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCOTTISH SEA FARMS LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SALMAR ASA
|
|
Defendant
OCEAN QUALITY USA INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OCEAN QUALITY PREMIUM BRANDS INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OCEAN QUALITY NORTH AMERICA INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OCEAN QUALITY AS
|
|
Defendant
MOWI ASA
|
|
Defendant
MARINE HARVEST CANADA INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEROY SEAFOOD GROUP ASA
|
|
Defendant
GRIEG SEAFOOD BC LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GRIEG SEAFOOD ASA
|
|
Defendant
DUCKTRAP RIVER OF MAINE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PORTLAND HUNT-ALPINE CLUB LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
55 | 55
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Civil Transfer
Thu 04/09 9:52 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Florida has been opened on 04/09/202 as case 1:20-cv-21509. (mlm) |
|
54 | 54
misc
Interdistrict Case Transfer OUT
Thu 04/09 9:39 AM
Interdistrict transfer to District of Southern District of Florida (tcs) |
|
53 | 53
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1
Thu 04/09 9:11 AM
ORDER granting52 Motion to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Florida By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
52 | 52
![]() Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Florida by LEROY SEAFOOD USA INC Responses due by 4/29/2020. (WEBBERT, DAVID) |