Weinhoffer v. TimeCyn Consulting LP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-35623
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-35623
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03621 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
TimeCyn Consulting LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Weinhoffer, Liquidating Trustee of the Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 02/07 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/05 12:27 PM
Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Signed on 2/5/2020. (TylerLaws) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate
Mon 01/13 11:33 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By David Weinhoffer ) (Rubio, Charles) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/13 11:10 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by David Weinhoffer (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 01/08 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Generic Motion (Adversary)
Mon 01/06 12:47 PM
Order on Agreed Motion to Suspend Deadlines Signed on 1/6/2020. (TylerLaws) Modified on 1/6/2020 (TylerLaws) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Thu 01/02 4:23 PM
Notice of Settlement and Agreed Motion to Suspend Deadlines . Filed by David Weinhoffer(Rubio, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Generic Motion (Adversary)
Fri 12/13 3:00 PM
Motion Notice of Pending Settlement and Agreed Motion to Suspend Deadlines Filed by David Weinhoffer (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Thu 12/12 12:49 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00 am. Telephonic Appearances: Charles Rubio for the Plaintiff. Matthew Probus for the Defendant. Agreed Judgment to be filed no later than 1/10/20. (TylerLaws) |
||
Friday, November 29, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/29 8:58 AM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Filed by TimeCyn Consulting LP (Probus, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Mon 11/18 3:36 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By David Weinhoffer ). (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 10/23 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/23/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate
Tue 10/22 9:00 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By David Weinhoffer ) (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI)
Mon 10/21 2:00 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/03 2:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on TimeCyn Consulting LP 10/1/2019. (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 10/01 2:37 PM
Summons Issued on TimeCyn Consulting LP Date Issued 10/1/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Mon 09/30 1:33 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on TimeCyn Consulting LP. (Rubio, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 09/30 1:32 PM
Adversary case 19-03621 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint by David Weinhoffer against TimeCyn Consulting LP. Fee Amount $350 (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |