Weinhoffer v. Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-35623
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-35623
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03622 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Weinhoffer, Liquidating Trustee of the Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Sunday, March 22, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 03/22 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/22/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/20 10:34 AM
Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding 4:19-ap-3622 Signed on 3/20/2020. (TylerLaws) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 02/27 8:42 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by David Weinhoffer (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, December 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/14 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Thu 12/12 2:29 PM
Comprehensive Scheduling, Pre-trial and Trial Order, Signed on 12/12/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Pre-Trial Order due by 2/2/2021. Discovery due by 12/11/2020. Trial date set for 3/1/2021 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Thu 12/12 12:50 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held:. Appearances: Charles Rubio for the Plaintiff. James King for the Defendant. Dates provided to counsel, scheduling order signed on the record. (TylerLaws) |
||
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
7
pgs
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Thu 12/05 6:42 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By David Weinhoffer ). (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/26 9:00 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC (King, James) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 10/23 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/23/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate
Tue 10/22 9:01 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By David Weinhoffer ) (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI)
Mon 10/21 2:00 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/03 2:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC 10/1/2019. (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 10/01 2:43 PM
Summons Issued on Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC Date Issued 10/1/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Mon 09/30 1:37 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC. (Rubio, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 09/30 1:36 PM
Adversary case 19-03622 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by David Weinhoffer against Billman Oil and Gas Management LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Rubio, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Adversary Cover Sheet |