Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10512

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:19-ap-01275
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2019
Terminated:Apr 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Paulson
9648 Smith Road
San Carlos, CA 92371
Represented By
John Paulson
contact info
Plaintiff
GrowCo, Inc.
335 A. Josephine St.
Denver, CO 80206
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info
David Warner
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, April 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/03 7:40 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-01275 JGR Closed. (jc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 29, 2020
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/30 8:26 AM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, March 27, 2020
26 26 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/27 11:50 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulation
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 03/27 11:51 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01275 JGR. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
25 25 motion Stipulation Thu 03/26 3:47 PM
Stipulation Between GrowCo, Inc. and Defendant Re: of Dismissal Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Warner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, December 19, 2019
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/19 10:31 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 7016 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
23 23 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Tue 12/17 2:54 PM
Order And Notice Of Trial Related Deadlines Pursuant To Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7016 (Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)) Related [+]. Discovery due by 4/17/2020 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 5/1/2020 for1 , Pre-Trial Statement due by 6/1/2020 for1 , Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 6/23/2020 at 11:00 AM Courtroom B for1 , . Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020 for1 , Witnesses and Exhibits due by 6/1/2020 for1 , (jc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, December 16, 2019
22 22 misc 7026 (f) Report Mon 12/16 5:16 PM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 17 Order to File
Sunday, November 10, 2019
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/10 10:26 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Friday, November 08, 2019
20 20 court Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Fri 11/08 11:43 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the Hearing Held on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 10/17/2019 has been filed. Pursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+]. (tjv)
Related: [-] 19 Transcript
19 19 trans Transcript Fri 11/08 11:41 AM
Transcript of Hearing Held on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Date Of Hearing: 10/17/2019 before Judge Joseph G. Rosania, Jr.. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING, TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 2/6/2020. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Requested by GOLDMAN SCARLATO & PENNY, PC on 10/24/2019. Transcribed and filed by AB Court Reporting & Video. Total cost of Transcript $106.25 Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/15/2019. Redaction Request Due By 11/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/9/2019. Transcript Access Will Be Restricted Through 2/6/2020. (tjv)
Related: [-] 14 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
Saturday, November 02, 2019
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 11/04 9:26 AM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order to File
Thursday, October 31, 2019
17 17 order File Thu 10/31 11:03 AM
Order For Compliance With Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7026 (Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)) Related [+]. Written Report due by 12/16/2019 for1 , (jc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/30 5:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Steven E. Abelman on behalf of John Paulson Related [+]. (Abelman, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, October 19, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/19 10:28 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
Thursday, October 17, 2019
14 14 order Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order Thu 10/17 2:58 PM
Minutes of Proceedings. Preliminary hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed September 30, 2019 (Docket #6), and any response that may be filed thereto. Oral findings and conclusions made of record IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed September 30, 2019 (Docket #6) is DENIED. Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
13 13 answer Response Wed 10/16 6:00 PM
Response Filed by Steven E. Abelman on behalf of John Paulson Related [+]. (Abelman, Steven)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
12 12 misc Witness List and Exhibits Tue 10/15 4:28 PM
List of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Reschedule Hearing
Sunday, October 06, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/06 10:25 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Reschedule Hearing
Saturday, October 05, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/05 10:26 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 10/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, October 04, 2019
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/04 3:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Reschedule Hearing
8 8 order Reschedule Hearing Fri 10/04 2:54 PM
Order Rescheduling Preliminary Hearing. The preliminary hearing presently scheduled to commence on Tuesday, October 8, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. is rescheduled and will commence on Thursday, October 17, 2019, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom B, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, U.S. Custom House, 721 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80202. The Plaintiff shall serve this Order by mail and by email to all parties reflected on the certificate of service for the Motion. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/17/2019 at 01:00 PM Courtroom B for6 ,. (jc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Thursday, October 03, 2019
7 7 order Set Hearing (Adversary) Thu 10/03 3:27 PM
Order Setting Preliminary Hearing. A preliminary hearing to consider the Motion and any response that may be filed thereto will be held on Tuesday, October 8, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom B, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, U.S. Custom House, 721 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80202. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/8/2019 at 01:30 PM Courtroom B for6 , . (jc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Monday, September 30, 2019
6 6 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 09/30 2:57 PM
Motion For Temporary Restraining Order Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Mon 09/30 2:52 PM
Summons Service Executed On: John Paulson on 9/30/19 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 09/30 2:50 PM
Summons Issued on John Paulson Answer Due 10/30/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 09/30 2:49 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Warner, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 09/30 2:48 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01275 JGR] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A27615720. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 2:45 PM
Adversary case 19-01275 Complaint by GrowCo, Inc. against John Paulson. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 01/28/2020 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1