Norwich v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45840 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Connecticut, 3:19-cv-00770 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:26 PM EST |
Defendant
Allergan PLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN PLC, f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC as successor-in-interest of Kinray, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. f/k/a Caremark PCS Health, L.P. d/b/a CVS Caremark
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Hickma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kapoor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Norwich
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/08/2019 9:59 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. from Superior Court, Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-CV-19-6040618-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5287841, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc..(Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 197 pgs Exhibit 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Walgreens Appearance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 All Court Filings, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice of No Pending Motions(Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2019. Discovery due by 11/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
7 | 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of7 Protective Order,4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,2 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,6 Electronic Filing Order,3 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases | ||
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Noonan, Patrick) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Actavis Inc (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Romanowska Larson on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Martin on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Martin, David) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
15 | 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Ferron on behalf of City of Norwich (Ferron, Margaret) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
17 | 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
18 | 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
19 | 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
20 | 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
21 | 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Sheldon, Tara) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sheldon, Tara) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
24 | 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
25 | 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference1 Notice of Removal, by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
26 | 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri L. Chase on behalf of Walmart Inc (Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
27 | 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. (Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
28 | 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Walmart Inc.(Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
29 | 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of John Kapoor (Richard, Steven) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
30 | 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
31 | 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for the individual Sackler Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 Notice of Removal, by Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Kiernan, John) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
32 | 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Noonan, Patrick) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
33 | 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Danehy Cox on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
34 | 34 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Removal Statement(Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibits A and B | ||
35 | 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONDUCT FED.R.CIV.P. 26(f) CONFERENCE1 Notice of Removal, by Cardinal Health Inc. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
36 | 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc identifying Corporate Parent CARDINAL HEALTH INC. for Cardinal Health Inc. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
37 | 37 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Robertson, Jr on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Robertson, James) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
38 | 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after court's decision on Plaintiff's motion to remand or MDL decision on conditional transfer to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference1 Notice of Removal, by John Kapoor. (Richard, Steven) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
39 | 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Matthew Abramoske on behalf of Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc. (Abramoske, Bryan) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
40 | 40 ORDER. The25 ,28 ,31 ,35 , and38 consented motions for extension of time are GRANTED as follows. All defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference is extended until 60 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/29/2019. (Barclay, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
41 | 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
42 | 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Martin, David) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
43 | 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Spears, Brian) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
44 | 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Eastwood, Janna) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
45 | 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Spears, Brian) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
46 | 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate MDL by Walmart Inc.Responses due by 6/26/2019(Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
47 | 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler (Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
48 | 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Richard Sackler (Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
49 | 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
50 | 50 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314873) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler.(Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mara Leventhal, Esq. | ||
51 | 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314938) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler.(Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. | ||
52 | 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314985) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler.(Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. | ||
53 | 53 NOTICE by Walmart Inc COURT ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS IN SIMILAR CASE(Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit District Court Minute Entry | ||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
54 | 54 ORDER granting50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/12/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
55 | 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316560) by City of Norwich.(Ferron, Margaret) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Judith S. Scolnick | ||
56 | 56 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316591) by City of Norwich.(Ferron, Margaret) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joseph G. Cleemann | ||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
57 | 57 ORDER granting55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/13/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
58 | 58 ORDER. The46 motion to stay is GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED until the JPML issues a final decision on whether to transfer this action to the MDL. If the JPML decides not to transfer the action, any party may file a motion to lift the stay within 7 days of such decision, attaching a copy of the decision to the motion. The Court will then set a briefing schedule on any motion to remand. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/13/2019. (Barclay, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
59 | 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
60 | 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Joseph, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
61 | 61 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314938) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Joseph, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
62 | 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Leventhal on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Leventhal, Mara) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
63 | 63 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re50 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314873) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Leventhal, Mara) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
64 | 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Pepe on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Pepe, Douglas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
65 | 65 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314985) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Pepe, Douglas) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
66 | 66 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacey Anne Mahoney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5327895) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc..(Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Affidavit Supporting Pro Hac Vice Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
67 | 67 ORDER granting66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/21/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
68 | 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith S. Scolnick on behalf of City of Norwich (Scolnick, Judith) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
69 | 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316560) by City of Norwich. (Scolnick, Judith) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
70 | 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cleemann on behalf of City of Norwich (Cleemann, Joseph) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
71 | 71 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re56 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316591) by City of Norwich. (Cleemann, Joseph) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | ||
72 | 72 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel; MDL Panel. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from ctd on 10/2/2019.] | |
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
73 | 73 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Connecticut. Case number 3:19-cv-00770. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |