DeGiacomo v. General Landscape Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13328
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13328
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01117 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
General Landscape Corporation
318 Whiting Avenue
Dedham, MA 02026 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark G. DeGiacomo
Chapter 7 Trustee Murtha Cullina LLP 99 High Street 20th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 02/03 9:42 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 19-01117 Complaint Dismissed. (jreg) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 02/03 9:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1117 Closed (jreg) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice
Fri 01/17 12:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 01/17 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/14 9:44 AM
Order dated 1/14/2020 Re: Clerk's Entry: Order granting Motion to Compromise entered in Main Case No. 17-13328 Document #169. IN VIEW OF THE COURT'S APPROVAL OF THE PARTIES' COMPROMISE AS TO THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING, THE PARTIES SHALL, ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 28, 2020, FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT. (jreg) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
court
Entry
Thu 12/05 2:28 PM
Clerk's Entry: Order granting Motion to Compromise entered in Main Case No. 17-13328 Document #169. (jreg) |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
court
Entry
Wed 11/20 11:09 AM
Clerk's Entry: A Motion to Approve Stipulation Between Chapter 7 Trustee and General Landscape Corporation has been filed in the main case 17-13328 at #161. (jreg) |
||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 10/03 11:50 AM
Summons Service Executed on General Landscape Corporation 10/3/2019 (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 10/03 9:09 AM
Summons Issued on General Landscape Corporation. Answer Due 11/4/2019. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/02 4:08 PM
Adversary case 19-01117 Complaint by Mark G. DeGiacomo against General Landscapre Corporation. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |