Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-05965
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2019
Case in other court:California Eastern, 2:19-cv-01707
Last checked: Sunday Mar 22, 2020 1:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Kalfayan
Represented By
Robin Lynn Greenwald
Weitz And Luxenberg, P.C.
contact info
Devin Lynn Bolton
Weitz& Luxenberg, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2019
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/07 1:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 11/07 1:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 11/07 1:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/16 10:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Kalfayan. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Greenwald, Robin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 10/03 12:41 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 10/03 2:27 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of California, 2:19-cv-01707 Kalfayan v. Monsanto, opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-05965-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 151 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
5 5 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. Electronic transfer sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
4 4 SUPPLEMENT to Civil Cover Sheet by John Kalfayan. (Bolton, Devin) Modified on 8/30/2019 (Benson, A.).
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Monsanto Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Devin Lynn Bolton* *700 Broadway* *New York, NY 10003*. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company by John Kalfayan. Attorney Bolton, Devin Lynn added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8434534)(Bolton, Devin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet