New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:19-cr-00453
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2019
Last checked: Friday Oct 04, 2019 3:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Kevin Carriker (4)
Represented By
Randi L. Chavis
Federal Defenders Of New York, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Mark Lamica (2)
Represented By
Joseph F. Kilada
Law Offices Of Joseph F. Kilada
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lara Treinis Gatz
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/04/2019 4:36 AM EDT
Friday, April 19, 2019
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Kwasi Asare (1), Mark Lamicka (2), James Garniere (3), Kevin Carriker (4). (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealing Cover Sheet
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
Arrest of Kevin Carriker in Central District of Califonia. (Florio, Lisa) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
Arrest of Kevin Carriker in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Western Division - Los Angeles). (Marziliano, August) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Mark Lamicka in Central District of Califonia. (Florio, Lisa) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
8 8 Letter MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Kwasi Asare, Mark Lamicka, James Ganiere, Kevin Carriker. (Florio, Lisa) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting8 Motion to Unseal Case as to Kwasi Asare (1), Mark Lamicka (2), James Ganiere (3), Kevin Carriker (4). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/1/2019. (Florio, Lisa) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
11 11 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Mark Lamicka. (Florio, Lisa) (Florio, Lisa). [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit re Out of Distict Warrant,
Att: 2 Report commnecing criminal action,
Att: 3 EDNY arrest warrant and complaint,
Att: 4 Minutes of arrest on out of district warrant,
Att: 5 Notice of request for detention,
Att: 6 Advisement of statutory and constituional rights,
Att: 7 Minutes of detention hearing,
Att: 8 Waiver of rights,
Att: 9 Redacted affidavit of sureties,
Att: 10 Bond and conditions of release,
Att: 11 Transcript order
Att: 12 (5/14/2019) Financial affidavit
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
12 12 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Kevin Carriker (Marziliano, August) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT,
Att: 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION,
Att: 3 Defendant Kevin Carriker arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Eastern District of New York at Central Islip,
Att: 4 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT,
Att: 5 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION,
Att: 6 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS,
Att: 7 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT,
Att: 8 WAIVER OF RIGHTS,
Att: 9 MINUTES OF Detention Hearing,
Att: 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS DETENTION ORDER,
Att: 11 WARRANT OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT
14 14 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Kevin Carriker. (Florio, Lisa) (Florio, Lisa). [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit re Out of District Warrant,
Att: 2 Report commencing criminal action,
Att: 3 EDNY arrest warrant and complaint,
Att: 4 Minutes of arrest on out of district warrant,
Att: 5 Notice of request for detention,
Att: 6 Advisement of statutory and constituional rights,
Att: 7 Waiver of rights,
Att: 8 Minutes of Detention Hearing,
Att: 9 Minutes of in chambers detention order,
Att: 10 Warrant of removal and commitment
Att: 11 (5/15/2019) Financial affidavit
23 23 CJA 20 as to Mark Lamicka: Appointment of Attorney Joseph F. Kilada for Mark Lamicka. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/14/2019. (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Arraignment and Initial Appearance as to Mark Lamicka (2) Count Complaint held on 5/15/2019. Defendant present with CJA counsel Joseph Kilada. AUSA: Lara Gatz. Preliminary Hearing Waived. Waiver executed. Order Setting Conditions of Release and Bond entered for defendant. Application and Order of Excludable Delay executed. The defendant waives speedy indictment time from 5/15/19 through 7/15/19. Defendant released on bond. Suretors present in courtroom. Court reviews conditions and advises risks of signing bond. Suretors acknowledge and agreed to sign bond. (FTR Log #12:55-1:04.) (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
22 22 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mark Lamicka (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
24 24 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Mark Lamicka (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mark Lamicka Time excluded from 5/15/19 until 7/15/19.Signed by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/15/2019. (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Mark Lomicka. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/15/2019. (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
27 27 REDACTION by Mark Lamicka to26 1 - Sealed Document CR, Order Setting Conditions of Release (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
Oral MOTION to Remand to custody of USMS pending trial by USA as to Kevin Carriker. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: Arraignment and Initial Appearance as to Kevin Carriker (4) Count Complaint held on 6/7/2019. APPEARANCES: Defendant present in custody with Randi Chavis (Federal Defenders) and AUSA Lara Gatz. Defendant arraigned and informed of his rights. Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Government moves for detention pending trial. No bail package presented by defendant. Order of detention executed, without prejudice to defendant bringing an appropriate package. Joint motion made to exclude speedy indictment time. Order of excludable delay executed through 7/15/2019. Defendant remains in custody. (FTR Log #1:50-12:58.) (McMorrow, Karen) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
38 38 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kevin Carriker. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/7/2019. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
39 39 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kevin Carriker Time excluded from 6/7/2019 until 7/15/2019.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/7/2019. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
43 43 Letter regarding Rule 16 discovery as to Kwasi Asare, Mark Lamicka, James Ganiere, Kevin Carriker (Gatz, Lara) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
44 44 Letter regarding Rule 16 discovery as to Kwasi Asare, Mark Lamicka, James Ganiere, Kevin Carriker (Gatz, Lara) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
48 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Status Conference as to Mark Lamicka held on 7/10/2019. Appearances: for Government: Lara Gatz; for defendant: Joseph Kilada, CJA. Defendant appears via telephone from California. APPLICATION AND ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY EXECUTED. Defendant waives speedy indictment time from 7/10/2019 through 9/20/2019. Defendant resides in California. With permission of Court and defendant, Mark Lamicka's waiver signed and initialed by attorney Joseph Kilada, present in courtroom, then initialed by AUSA Lara Gatz and Court. Defendant continued on bond. Conditions remain the same. (FTR Log #2:46-2:51.) (Ryan, Mary) Modified on 7/29/2019 to add text(Ryan, Mary). [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
49 49 APPLICATION AND ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Mark Lamicka. Time excluded from 7/10/2019 through 9/20/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/10/2019. (Ryan, Mary) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
52 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Status Conference as to Kevin Carriker held on 7/10/2019. Appearances: for Government: Lara Gatz; for defendant, Randi Chavis, Fed. Def. Defendant in custody appears with counsel. APPLICATION AND ORDER FO EXCLUDABLE DELAY EXECUTED. Defendant waives speedy indictment time from 7/10/2019 through 9/20/2019. Defendant continues in custody. (FTR Log #10:31-10:34.) (Ryan, Mary) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
53 53 APPLICATION AND ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY EXECUTED as to Kevin Carriker. Time excluded from 7/10/2019 through 9/20/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/10/2019. (Ryan, Mary) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference as to Kevin Carriker held on 9/17/2019. Lara Gatz for the government. Randi Chavis for the defendant. All parties present. Waiver of speedy indictment executed. Time excluded from 9/17/2019 through 10/4/2019. (Gandiosi, Kristin) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
56 56 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kevin Carriker Time excluded from 9/17/2019 until 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/17/2019. (Gandiosi, Kristin) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
59 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Status Conference as to Mark Lamicka held on 9/20/2019. Appearances: for Government: Mark Misorek for Lara Gatz; for defendant: Joseph Kilada, CJA. Defendant appears via telephone from California. APPLICATION AND ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY executed. The defendantwaives speedy indictment time from 9/20/19 thru 11/20/19. Defendant resides in California with permissionof the court and defendant, Mark Lamickas waiver signed and initialed by attorneyJoseph Kilada, present in courtroom, then initialed by AUSA Mark Misorek. Defendant remains on Bond. (FTR Log #11:26-11:32.) (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
60 60 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mark Lamicka Time excluded from 9/20/19 until 11/20/19.Signed by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/20/2019. (Torres, Jasmine) [2:19-mj-00376-AYS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
61 61 INDICTMENT as to Mark Lamica (2) count(s) 1, 2, Kevin Carriker (4) count(s) 1, 2. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet