California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Alexander F Mackinnon
Case #: 2:19-cv-08598
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2019
Terminated:Jan 24, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Apr 02, 2020 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Jennifer Lopez
Plaintiff
Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC
Represented By
Peter E Perkowski
Perkowski Legal PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, January 27, 2020
18 18 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Mon 01/27 8:43 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (shb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Dismissal
Friday, January 24, 2020
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 01/24 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/02 4:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. upon Jennifer Lopez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John Quinn, KAPLAN HECKER & FINK LLP, counsel. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/02 4:09 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 16, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 12/27 10:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
13 13 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 10/24 10:20 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08598 DDP(AFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 10/08 1:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to defendant Jennifer Lopez. (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Summons Request Tue 10/08 12:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 10/08 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request9 . The following error(s) was found: RE "To:" area.. filer has added "TBA", it appears filer means address to be announced.. However, the "TO:" area is to be directed to the named defendant only with either NO address or with an address. Please remove the "TBA" from the "TO:" area. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
9 9 notice Summons Request Mon 10/07 1:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Summons Mon 10/07 12:29 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 10/07 12:23 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 10/07 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 05, 2019
5 5 notice Summons Request Sat 10/05 2:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Sat 10/05 2:53 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 10/05 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC, identifying Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC and Jennifer Lopez. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 10/05 2:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 10/05 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24561089 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Attorney Peter E Perkowski added to party Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC(pty:pla))(Perkowski, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B