Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC v. Jennifer Lopez
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dean D Pregerson |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-08598 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 02, 2020 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jennifer Lopez
|
|
Plaintiff
Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. upon Jennifer Lopez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John Quinn, KAPLAN HECKER & FINK LLP, counsel. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 16, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (shb) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (shb) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08598 DDP(AFMx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to defendant Jennifer Lopez. (lc) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request9 . The following error(s) was found: RE "To:" area.. filer has added "TBA", it appears filer means address to be announced.. However, the "TO:" area is to be directed to the named defendant only with either NO address or with an address. Please remove the "TBA" from the "TO:" area. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) |
|
Saturday, October 05, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC, identifying Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC and Jennifer Lopez. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24561089 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Attorney Peter E Perkowski added to party Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC(pty:pla))(Perkowski, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |