Krisko v. Marvel Entertainment, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-09256 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 04, 2020 6:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Amazon.Com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Television, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FOX Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shuki Levy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marvel Entertainment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Haim Saban
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Walt Disney Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chappell Music, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald Aaron Wasserman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zoltan Krisko
2929 NE 40th Street
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
UMG Recordings Inc.
Terminated: 02/03/2020
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |