Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:19-cr-00731
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2019
Terminated:May 11, 2021
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2019 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
James Prince, Jr (1)
Represented By
Kent A Schaffer
Schaffer Carter & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason Edmund Corley
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Steven Donald Mellin
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/16/2021 5:16 PM CDT
Friday, September 06, 2019
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to James Prince, Jr (1), filed. (kmurphy, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs MOTION to Seal by USA as to James Prince, Jr, filed. (kmurphy, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to James Prince Jr (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo.) Parties notified.(kmurphy, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
***Set Hearing as to James Prince, Jr: Initial Appearance set for 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (kmurphy, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to James Prince, Jr: Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (cfelchak, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Arrest of James Prince, Jr. (cfelchakadi, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo as to James Prince, Jr, Defendant first appearance on Complaint. (Deft informed of rights). Defendant advises of retainment of counsel, Defendant appeared with counsel. Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo Trying to work out bond conditions. Appearances: AUSA Steve Mellin f/USA; Kent Schaffer Related [+] f/Deft.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Flor Troiani) Defendant remanded to custody, filed.(cfelchakadi, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-] tained
4 4 1 pgs Order of Detention Pending Hearing as to James Prince, Jr Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 PM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
STATUS CONFERENCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo as to James Prince, Jr Defendant appeared with counsel. Bond set, Unsecured 100,000, Defendant advised of conditions of release,. Appearances: AUSA Steven Mellin f/USA; Schaffer Related [+] f/Deft.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Flor Troiani) Deft continued on bond, filed.(cfelchakadi, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-] tained
5 5 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to James Prince, Jr, filed. (pturner, ) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
15 15 Unsecured Bond Entered as to James Prince, Jr in amount of $ $100,000,, filed. (cfelchak, 4)
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to James Prince, Jr. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
6 6 4 pgs MOTION For Permission To Attend Event by James Prince, Jr, filed.(Schaffer, Kent) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit B
Thursday, September 26, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo: MOTION HEARING as to James Prince, Jr held on 9/26/2019 denying6 MOTION For Permission To Attend Event . Court advised defendant's counsel to try and come to an agreement regarding this issue, but at this time the modification is denied. Appearances: Jason Edmund Corley, Kent A Schaffer.(ERO:Yes) Deft continued on Bond, filed.(cfelchak, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF SETTING as to James Prince, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo, filed. (cfelchak, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
8 8 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James Prince, Jr re6 MOTION For Permission To Attend Event , filed.(Corley, Jason) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
ORAL ORDER as to James Prince, Jr9 Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non Party ,10 Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Patrick Clark ; Motion-related deadline set re:9 Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non Party ,10 Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Patrick Clark , ORDER Striking Document as to James Prince, Jr re9 Motion to Quash filed by James Prince, Jr,10 Motion to Quash filed by James Prince, Jr. Motion incorrectly filed on the magistrate case ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmarchand, 4) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non Party by James Prince, Jr, filed. (Radbil, Noah) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Patrick Clark by James Prince, Jr, filed. (Radbil, Noah) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James Prince, Jr re9 Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non Party ,10 Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Patrick Clark , filed.(Mellin, Steven) [4:19-mj-01705]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
12 12 1 pgs Related [+] INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to James Prince, Jr (1) count(s) 1, filed. (sanderson, 4)
Related: [-] dacted
Att: 1 (Unredacted) Indictment
13 13 1 pgs US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to James Prince, Jr, filed.(sanderson, 4)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs ORDER for Issuance of a Summons as to James Prince, Jr ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4)
Related: [-]