Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-43284

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:19-ap-04239
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2019
Terminated:Jun 16, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tina Bielefeld
1606 10th Street South
Princeton, MN 55371
Plaintiff
Erik A. Ahlgren, Trustee
220 W. Washington Ave. Suite 105
Fergus Falls, MN 56537
Represented By
Erik Ahlgren
Ahlgren Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
court MNB Close adversary case Tue 06/16 9:03 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4239 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
18 18 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 06/05 12:09 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by Erik A. Ahlgren, Trustee and Tina Bielefeld. Proposed order.(Ahlgren, Erik)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 06/05 2:13 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4239. Disposition: dismissed with prejudice. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/09 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/07 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
15 15 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 02/07 5:12 PM
Order for Appearance at Mediation Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 14 Order referring matter for mediation
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
14 14 order MNB Order (Generic) Wed 02/05 1:10 PM
Order Referring Matter for Mediation Related [+]. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint and12 Stipulation requesting extension of deadlines and request for mediation
Monday, February 03, 2020
13 13 order MNB Order for trial Mon 02/03 12:57 PM
Amended Scheduling Order and Order for Trial and for use of Electronic Evidence Related [+] Motions Due: 7/1/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Trial date set for 8/11/2020 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 02/03 9:47 AM
Stipulation filed by Tina Bielefeld and Erik Ahlgren, Trustee. Nature of stipulation: extend deadlines and mediation request(Dicker, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
11 11 order MNB Order for trial Tue 12/10 11:50 AM
Scheduling Order and Order for Trial and for use of Electronic Evidenc Related [+] Motions Due: 5/1/2020. Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Trial date set for 6/9/2020 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, December 02, 2019
10 10 answer MNB Answer to complaint Mon 12/02 2:20 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Tina Bielefeld. (Dicker, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/15 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
8 8 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 11/12 3:59 PM
Order Re: Related [+]. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation for extension of time to answer complaint
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 11/12 11:24 AM
Stipulation filed by Tina Bielefeld and Erik A Ahlgren, Trustee. Nature of stipulation: extend time to file answer(Dicker, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 12, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/12 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 10/11 12:53 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Erik A. Ahlgren, Trustee.(Ahlgren, Erik)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding
Thursday, October 10, 2019
4 4 court MNB Pro bono notice to defendants Thu 10/10 2:06 PM
Pro bono notice to defendants re:1 Complaint. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Thu 10/10 2:06 PM
Summons issued on Tina Bielefeld Date Issued 10/10/2019, Answer Due 11/12/2019 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee MNB Trustee's statement of insufficient funds to pay filing fees Thu 10/10 1:56 PM
Trustee's statement of insufficient funds to pay filing fees.(Ahlgren, Erik)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Thu 10/10 1:55 PM
Adversary case 19-04239 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Erik A. Ahlgren, Trustee against Tina Bielefeld. No Fee. (Ahlgren, Erik)
Related: [-]