Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03716
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 08, 2020 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
CLAYTON CROWELL
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/23 9:44 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CLAYTON CROWELL. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 1:03 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4652925.), filed by CLAYTON CROWELL. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/15 9:00 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]