Minnesota District Court
Judge:Wilhelmina M Wright
Referred: Katherine M Menendez
Case #: 0:19-cv-02703
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2019
Terminated:Apr 06, 2020
Case in other court:State of Minnesota, County of Ramsey, NA
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 08, 2020 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer M Robbins
Madel PA
contact info
Stephen M Premo
Madel PA
contact info
Christopher W. Madel
Madel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jafar Ahmed
Represented By
William Christopher Penwell
Siegel Brill, P.A.
contact info
John M Dornik
Siegel Brill, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Masud Omar Ali
Represented By
William Christopher Penwell
Siegel Brill, P.A.
contact info
John M Dornik
Siegel Brill, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Dhulqarnayn Ahmed Billow
Represented By
William Christopher Penwell
Siegel Brill, P.A.
contact info
John M Dornik
Siegel Brill, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Hamza Ahmed Billow
Represented By
William Christopher Penwell
Siegel Brill, P.A.
contact info
John M Dornik
Siegel Brill, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Hussen Osman
Represented By
William Christopher Penwell
Siegel Brill, P.A.
contact info
John M Dornik
Siegel Brill, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
32 32 1 pgs order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Tue 04/07 8:34 AM
JUDGMENT(JME)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Monday, April 06, 2020
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/06 11:18 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/6/2020. (RJE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
30 30 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 04/03 5:14 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re29 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/03 5:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Masud Omar Ali, Jafar Ahmed, Hamza Ahmed Billow, Dhulqarnayn Ahmed Billow,, and Hussen Osman. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
28 28 order Order/Notice to Attorney Fri 03/20 1:13 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The parties are in the midst of negotiating a possible settlement in this case, and have requested a modest extension of the deadlines contained in the current pretrial schedule. (ECF 19 (schedule) and ECF 27 (request)). In addition, COVID-19 and the national response to that pandemic has undoubtedly further delayed both negotiations and discovery in this matter. The Court will, if needed, adjust the deadlines that govern this case based on a stipulation by the parties. However, counsel are encouraged to continue sincere efforts to resolve this case so that additional discovery will not be needed. Counsel should email the Court about the progress of negotiations or the plans to submit a stipulation regarding schedule adjustments by April 8, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/20/2020. (LCC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
27 27 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/11 3:24 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jafar Ahmed, Masud Omar Ali, Dhulqarnayn Ahmed Billow, Hamza Ahmed Billow, Hussen Osman . (Penwell, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
26 26 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 02/28 11:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Settlement Conference held on 2/28/2020. Settlement was not reached, however discussions are ongoing. (KAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
25 25 notice Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing Fri 02/07 7:47 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The Settlement Conference will commence on 2/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. **THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY** (KAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
24 24 minutes Status Conference Tue 01/28 1:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 1/28/2020. (KAT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/04 4:48 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
22 22 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 11/25 12:23 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/25/2019. (KAT)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 11/25 12:15 PM
ORDER/NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Confidential Letter to Court due by 2/18/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 2/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/25/2019. (KAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/21 11:56 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 4/17/2020. Motions (disp) due by 8/12/2020. Ready for trial due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/21/2019. (KAT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
20 20 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 11/21 12:51 PM
AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2019. (KAT)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 11/21 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2019. Scheduling Order to be issued. (KAT)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Protective Order Wed 11/20 11:35 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/20/2019. (KAT)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 10:22 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. filed by Hussen Osman, Hamza Ahmed Billow, Jafar Ahmed, Masud Omar Ali, Dhulqarnayn Ahmed Billow. No summons requested. (Penwell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-8
15 15 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 11/20 9:18 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re14 Stipulation. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Wed 11/20 9:16 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 11/20 8:20 AM
ORDER on11 Stipulation to Serve and File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/20/2019. (KAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
12 12 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 11/19 4:46 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re11 Stipulation,. (Penwell, William)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 11/19 4:43 PM
STIPULATION to Serve and File Amended Complaint by Jafar Ahmed, Masud Omar Ali, Dhulqarnayn Ahmed Billow, Hamza Ahmed Billow, Hussen Osman. Jointly Signed by Masud Omar Ali, Jafar Ahmed, Hamza Ahmed Billow, Hussen Osman, and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Penwell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Amended Complaint
Friday, November 15, 2019
10 10 misc Report Fri 11/15 9:42 AM
REPORT Rule 26(f) Report by Jafar Ahmed, Masud Omar Ali, Dhulqarnayn Ahmed Billow, Hamza Ahmed Billow, Hussen Osman. (Penwell, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
9 9 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 10/16 10:20 AM
ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/16/2019.(KAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
8 8 misc Jury Demand Wed 10/16 9:55 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/15 9:29 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2703 (WMW/KMM). (lmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Judge Practice Pointers Tue 10/15 2:19 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
6 6 service Certificate of Service Fri 10/11 5:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re5 Answer to Complaint,3 Declaration,1 Notice of Removal,4 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,2 Declaration (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/11 5:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Fri 10/11 5:09 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 10/11 5:06 PM
DECLARATION of Timothy Luskin re1 Notice of Removal, by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. . (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 10/11 5:04 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher W. Madel re1 Notice of Removal, by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. .(Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/11 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, County of Ramsey, Second Judicial District, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7205352) filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. No summons requested. (Madel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet