Clark v. Student Loan Finance Corporati
Original Case: 1:18-cv-09354
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03263 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2020 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Student Loan Finance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sean A. Clark
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/11/2020 3:32 AM EST |
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sean A. Clark, FILED. [2676662] 19-3263 [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:46 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 10 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2676665] 19-3263 [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:48 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Sean A. Clark, district court receipt # 465401245630, FILED.[2676670] 19-3263 [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:51 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2676672] 19-3263 [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:51 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2676673] 19-3263 [Entered: 10/09/2019 04:52 PM] |