Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:19-mj-00782
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2019
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2019 3:26 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sekret T. Sneed
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Oscar Roman Rosillo (1)
Terminated: 09/13/2019
Represented By
Stephen Patrick Johnson
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info
Defendant
Gypsy Irarte Tupano (2)
Terminated: 09/13/2019
Represented By
Stephen Patrick Johnson
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2021 10:48 PM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2019
Arrest (Rule 40) of Oscar Roman Rosillo, Gypsy Irarte Tupano. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Case Closed. Defendant Oscar Roman Rosillo terminated. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Transmittal of Rule 5(c)(3) Documents as to Oscar Roman Rosillo, sent to USDC SD FL via InterdistrictTransfer email, with certified copy of Bond and docket sheet. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Case Closed. Defendant Gypsy Irarte Tupano terminated. (tcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Stephen Patrick Johnson (IA ONLY) as to Oscar Roman Rosillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/13/2019. (tcc)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Oscar Roman Rosillo held on 9/13/2019, Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Waiver filed. Bond Hearing held, Appearance Bond (Unsecured) set in the amount of $25,000. Defendant released. (Tape #FTR) (tcc)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5 Identity Hearings by Oscar Roman Rosillo. (tcc)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Oscar Roman Rosillo. (tcc)
Related: [-]
5 5 Appearance Bond (Unsecured) on Rule 5(c)(3) Entered as to Oscar Roman Rosillo in the amount of $25,000. (tcc)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Oscar Roman Rosillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/13/2019. (tcc)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Stephen Patrick Johnson (IA ONLY) for Gypsy Irarte Tupano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/13/2019. (tcc)
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Gypsy Irarte Tupano held on 9/13/2019, Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Waiver filed. Bond Hearing held, Appearance Bond (Unsecured) set in the amount of $10,000. Defendant released. (Tape #FTR) Interpreted by Laura Hamm.(tcc)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Rule 5 Identity Hearings by Gypsy Irarte Tupano. (tcc)
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Gypsy Irarte Tupano. (tcc)
Related: [-]
11 11 Appearance Bond (Unsecured) on Rule 5(c)(3) Entered as to Gypsy Irarte Tupano in the amount of $10,000. (tcc)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gypsy Irarte Tupano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/13/2019. (tcc)
Related: [-]