Oxbridge Coins, Inc. et al v. Westford Rare Coins, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31040
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31040
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:19-ap-03047 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Westford Rare Coins, LLC
10750 Wilshire Blvd. 501
Los Angeles, CA 90024 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael P. Johnson
10750 Wilshire Blvd. 501
Los Angeles, CA 90024 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick Johnson, Patrick Johnson individually and dba Dollars & Cents
c/o 128 E. Main St.
Rochester, IL 62563 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Collectors Universe, Inc., Collectors Universe, Inc. dba Professional Coin Grading Service (PCGS)
1610 East St. Andrew Pl.
Santa Ana, CA 92705 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oxbridge Coins, Inc., Plaintiff
2115 Van Ness Avenue
san francisco, CA 94109 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oxbridge Coins, Inc.
2115 Van Ness Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94109 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 05/06 4:52 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:19-ap-3047. (lm) |
||
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
order
Stipulation
Mon 04/20 4:08 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . (lp) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Mon 04/20 4:42 PM
Hearing Dropped. The scheduling conference on 4/24/20 is dropped from the calendar. Case dismissed on 4/20/20. (lp) |
||
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
stip
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 04/17 10:11 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff E. Lynn Schoenmann. Case Management Action due after 05/1/2020. (Oliner, Aron) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice
Thu 03/05 3:04 PM
Notice Regarding [Notice of Substitution of Plaintiff and Counsel] Filed by Plaintiff E. Lynn Schoenmann. (Oliner, Aron) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
audio
audio
Fri 02/28 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/28/2020 1:44:31 PM ]. File Size [ 5808 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:06 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 02/28 5:28 PM
Hearing held and continued Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice
Tue 02/25 12:09 PM
Notice Regarding Withdrawal of Motion to Abstain . Filed by Defendants Michael P. Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC. (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Tue 02/25 4:36 PM
Hearing Dropped. The hearing on 2/28 regarding the motion to abstain is dropped from the calendar per the Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Abstain, dkt #35, filed on 2/25/20. (lp) |
||
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Conference Statement
Mon 02/24 4:27 PM
Status Conference Statement (1 Complaint. Plaintiff Oxbridge Coins, Inc. (Hiser, Miriam). DEFECTIVE ENTRY: PDF is blank on page #4. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document#1 and removed linkage from document(s) with no document numbers.Modified on 2/25/2020 (aw). |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Conference Statement
Fri 02/21 11:25 AM
Status Conference Statement [Trustee's Status Conference Statement] . Filed by Plaintiff E. Lynn Schoenmann (Oliner, Aron) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
order
Stipulation
Thu 02/06 2:30 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Re (1) Turnover of Coins, and (2) Dismissal with Prejudice of Collectors Universe, Inc. . (lp) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
stip
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/05 3:00 PM
Stipulation, (1) Turnover of Coins, and (2) Dismissal with Prejudice of Collectors Universe, Inc. Filed by Trustee E. Lynn Schoenmann. (Oliner, Aron) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
audio
audio
Fri 01/10 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/10/2020 10:33:08 AM ]. File Size [ 1924 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:01 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 01/10 11:56 AM
Hearing held and continued Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp) |
||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 01/10 11:57 AM
Hearing Continued Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp) |
||
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Reply
Fri 01/03 1:32 PM
Reply . Filed by Defendants Michael P. Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Fri 01/03 11:07 AM
Answer to Third Party Complaint Filed by Westford Rare Coins, LLC. (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice
Mon 12/30 5:15 PM
Notice Regarding Errata . Filed by Defendant Collectors Universe, Inc., Counter-Claimant Collectors Universe, Inc., 3rd Party Plaintiff Collectors Universe, Inc.. (Friedman, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Fri 12/27 12:23 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to [Opposition to Motion to Abstain] . Filed by Trustee E. Lynn Schoenmann (Heaton, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Aron M. Oliner | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Fri 12/27 12:17 PM
Answer to Third Party Complaint [Answer to Defendant Collectors Universe, Inc., DBA Professional Coin Grading Service's First Amended Counterclaim, Crossclaim and Joinder] Filed by E. Lynn Schoenmann. (Heaton, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/19 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 12/19/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 12/18 3:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on E. Lynn Schoenmann 12/17/2019 . (Friedman, Roger) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice
Tue 12/17 11:43 AM
Third Party Summons Issued on E. Lynn Schoenmann Answer Due 1/15/2020 |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 5:46 PM
Third Party Summons Issued on Collectors Universe, Inc. Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr). NOTE: Please disregard. Summons was not issued. Modified on 12/16/2019 (klr) |
|
20 | 20
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 5:31 PM
Third Party Summons Issued on E. Lynn Schoenmann Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr) . NOTE: Please disregard. Summons was not issued. Modified on 12/16/2019 (klr) |
|
19 | 19
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 5:09 PM
Third Party Summons Issued on E. Lynn Schoenmann Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr). NOTE: Please disregard. Summons was not issued. Modified on 12/16/2019 (klr) |
|
18 | 18
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 5:02 PM
Third Party Summons Issued on E. Lynn Schoenmann Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr). NOTE: Please disregard. Summons was not issued. Modified on 12/16/2019 (klr) |
|
17 | 17
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 4:53 PM
Third Party Summons Issued on Collectors Universe, Inc. Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr). NOTE: Please disregard. Summons was not issued. Modified on 12/16/2019 (klr) |
|
16 | 16
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 4:49 PM
Third Party Summons Issued on E. Lynn Schoenmann Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr). NOTE: Please disregard. Summons was not issued. Modified on 12/16/2019 (klr) |
|
15 | 15
court
Third Party Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 11:17 AM
Third Party Summons Issued on Collectors Universe, Inc. Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (klr) |
|
14 | 14
court
Summons Issued
Mon 12/16 11:08 AM
Summons Issued on Collectors Universe, Inc. Answer Due 1/15/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. NOTE: Please disregard and refer to document @15. (klr) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Third-Party Complaint
Fri 12/13 12:12 PM
Third-Party Complaint by Collectors Universe, Inc., E. Lynn Schoenmann against E. Lynn Schoenmann, Oxbridge Coins, Inc., Westford Rare Coins, LLC . (Friedman, Roger) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Thu 12/05 6:08 PM
Hearing Continued. The scheduling conference on 12/20/19 at 1:30 p.m. is continued to 1/10/20 at 10:30 a.m. Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp) |
||
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Continued Hearing
Wed 12/04 5:16 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 1/10/2020 at 10:30 AM San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali for 8 ,. Filed by Defendants Michael P. Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC. (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/03 5:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Defendant Collectors Universe, Inc., Cross-Claimant Collectors Universe, Inc. (Friedman, Roger) |
|
Friday, November 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
answer|cmp|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim|Crossclaim
Fri 11/29 4:04 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by Collectors Universe, Inc. against Oxbridge Coins, Inc. , Crossclaim by Collectors Universe, Inc. against Westford Rare Coins, LLC Filed by Collectors Universe, Inc.. (Friedman, Roger) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 11/15 1:29 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motoin to Abstain . Hearing scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 10:30 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. Filed by Defendants Michael P. Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC. (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Abstain and Remand
Fri 11/15 1:25 PM
Motion to Abstain and Remand (abstain only) Filed by Defendants Michael P. Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC. (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 11/14 1:58 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Defendants Michael P. Johnson, Patrick Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 11/14 1:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Michael P. Johnson, Patrick Johnson, Westford Rare Coins, LLC. (Hiser, Miriam) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 10/17 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Discovery
Tue 10/15 11:25 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lm) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 10/15 11:23 AM
Summons Issued on Collectors Universe, Inc. Answer Due 11/14/2019; Michael P. Johnson Answer Due 11/14/2019; Patrick Johnson Answer Due 11/14/2019; Westford Rare Coins, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2019 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lm) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Adversary Cover Sheet
Mon 10/14 10:22 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet . (Hadler, Mitchell) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/11 8:00 PM
Adversary case[LINK 19-03047 . 14 , 72 (Injunctive relief - other), 91 (Declaratory judgment) Complaint by Oxbridge Coins, Inc., Oxbridge Coins, Inc. against Westford Rare Coins, LLC, Michael P. Johnson, Patrick Johnson, Collectors Universe, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Hadler, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 |