Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-12239 |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Highland Capital Management, L.P.
300 Crescent Ct Ste 700
Dallas, TX 75201-7849 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Highland Unit Files Bankruptcy Over Disputed Crisis-Era Fund (2) (news.bloomberglaw.com) |
Submitted Thu 10/17/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
186 | 186
![]() Notice of Receipt of Record from Northern District of Texas. New Bankruptcy Case Number 19-34054 Filed by (DMC) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 12/10 9:25 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC) |
||
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
185 | 185
![]() Certificate of Service re: 1) Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case; and 2) [Corrected] Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
184 | 184
![]() ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE OF THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATESBANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS Order Signed on 12/4/2019. (CAS) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
183 | 183
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service for service of (1) [Signed] Final Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (B) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 168]; (2) [Signed] Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 327, 328, and 330 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtor to Retain, Employ and Compensate Certain Professionals Utilized by the Debtor in the Ordinary Course of Business [Docket No. 169]; and (3) [Signed] Order Pursuant to Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Local Rule 2014-1 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP as Counsel for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date [Docket No. 176] Filed by Highland Capital Management, L.P.. (O'Neill, James) |
|
182 | 182
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Transferring Venue of This Case to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Weissgerber, Jaclyn) |
|
181 | 181
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/2/19 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/2/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, eScribers, LLC, at Telephone number 973-406-2250. Filed by eScribers, LLC. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/10/2019. Redaction Request Due By 12/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/3/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/2/2020. (Murin, Leslie) |