Consolidated
Lead case: 1:14-md-02543

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:19-cv-09471
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2019
Terminated:May 05, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Apr 11, 2020 6:37 AM EDT
Defendant
General Motors LLC
Represented By
Andrew Baker Bloomer
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (il)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bertha Brown
Represented By
Alexander Dwyer
Kirkendall Dwyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By
Brett A. Emison
Langdon & Emison
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 17, 2022
52 52 order Protective Order Thu 02/17 2:15 PM
ORDER [Amending the Restrictions on Use of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information]. Defendants and Lead Counsel for plaintiffs having consented thereto, and for good cause shown, Order No. 10 Paragraph 7(a) (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No.2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italics) and as further set forth in this Order. In addition, Order No. 10 Paragraph 8 (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No. 2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italic) and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/17/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv)
Related: [-]