Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11363

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grant
Case #: 1:19-ap-01079
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2019
Terminated:Feb 21, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brandon Michael Muff
2031 McKinnie
Fort Wayne, IN 46806
Represented By
Brandon Michael Muff
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin M. Roach
Dustin M. Roach, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O.15588
Fort Wayne, IN 46885
Represented By
Dustin M. Roach
Van Gilder & Trzynka PC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 05/13 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion for Proceedings Supplemental
Monday, May 10, 2021
20 20 order Proceedings Supplemental Mon 05/10 10:41 AM
Order To Appear for Proceedings Supplemental and Order to Answer Interrogatories Related [+] Examination scheduled for 6/28/2021 at 10:00 A.M. in Room 1194 (Fort Wayne meeting room), Federal Building, 1300 South Harrison Street, Fort Wayne, Indiana. (sed)
Related: [-] 18
Sunday, May 09, 2021
19 19 misc Interrogatories Sun 05/09 8:24 PM
Trustee's Interrogatories to ALL TERRAIN CONVERSIONS Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach Related [+] (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Proceedings Supplemental filed by Dustin M. Roach
18 18 motion Proceedings Supplemental Sun 05/09 8:21 PM
Trustee's Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 04, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 12/05 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
16 16 5 pgs order Order Wed 12/02 9:50 AM
Order Rescheduling Proceedings Supplemental Related [+]. Examination rescheduled to 1/25/2021 at 10:30 A.M. in Room 1194 (Fort Wayne 341 meeting room), Federal Building, 1300 South Harrison Street, Fort Wayne, Indiana. (sed)
Related: [-] 12 14 Order on Motion for Proceedings Supplemental
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 11/26 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Proceedings Supplemental
Monday, November 23, 2020
14 14 order Proceedings Supplemental Mon 11/23 3:51 PM
Order to Appear for Proceedings Supplemental and Order to Answer Interrogatories Related [+]. Examination scheduled for 1/18/2021 at 10:00 A.M. in Room 1194 (Fort Wayne 341 meeting room), Federal Building, 1300 South Harrison Street, Fort Wayne, Indiana. (sed)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, November 19, 2020
13 13 misc Interrogatories Thu 11/19 8:46 PM
Trustee's Interrogatories to All Terrain Conversions Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach Related [+] (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-] 10 Judgment,12 Motion for Proceedings Supplemental filed by Dustin M. Roach
12 12 motion Proceedings Supplemental Thu 11/19 8:42 PM
Trustee's Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 02/14 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 02/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Judgment
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
10 10 order Judgment Tue 02/11 6:34 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (sed)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach
Sunday, February 09, 2020
9 9 notice Other Notice Sun 02/09 8:43 PM
Trustee's Notice Declaration in Support of Entry in Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach Related [+] (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Dustin M. Roach
8 8 motion Default Judgment Sun 02/09 8:41 PM
Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, December 15, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Sun 12/15 7:24 PM
Trustee's Certificate of Service regular, first class U.S. mail, postage fully prepaid Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach Related [+] (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-] 6 Alias Summons Issued
Monday, December 09, 2019
6 6 court Alias Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:28 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Brandon Michael Muff Date Issued 12/9/2019, Answer Due 1/8/2020. (sed)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 19, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 10/20 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order on Application to Defer Payment
Thursday, October 17, 2019
4 4 order Defer Payment Thu 10/17 8:05 AM
Order Granting Application to Defer Payment Related [+] in Adversary Proc. No. 1:19-ap-1079 (sed)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/17 7:58 AM
Summons Issued on Brandon Michael Muff Date Issued 10/17/2019, Answer Due 11/18/2019. (sed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
2 2 motion Defer Fee Wed 10/16 9:35 PM
Trustee's Application to Defer Fee in Adversary Proc. No. 1:19-ap-1079 Filed by Plaintiff Dustin M. Roach (Roach, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 9:28 PM
Adversary case 19-01079 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property), Complaint by Dustin M. Roach against Brandon Michael Muff. Receipt Number defer, Fee Amount $350. (Roach, Dustin) Modified on 10/17/2019 (sed).
Related: [-]