Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:19-cv-00878
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2019
Terminated:Jun 30, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 14, 2020 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc.
Represented By
Lindsey N Boyd
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Faith Clair Whittaker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Karla Walden
Represented By
Lindsey N Boyd
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Faith Clair Whittaker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Walsh
Represented By
Lindsey N Boyd
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Faith Clair Whittaker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lamin Suwareh
Represented By
Evan R McFarland
Spitz Law Firm LLC
contact info
Matthew G Bruce
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/30 4:31 PM
ORDER: The Court has been advised that this action has settled. The Court DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE, but provides that any party, within 60 days and upon good cause shown, may reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/30/20. (sct)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 05/26 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 07/07/2020 at 9:00AM in ADR Suite, Room 203, Cincinnati before Judge Matthew W. McFarland. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 02/27 5:17 PM
Order referring case to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 2/27/20. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
11 11 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 02/26 5:44 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Lay Witness due by 6/4/2020. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 7/3/2020. Defendant Primary Expert due by 8/5/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/5/2020. Discovery due by 9/21/2020. Dispositive motions due by 10/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 822. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 2/26/20. (sct)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 02/26 5:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/26/2020. Evan McFarland appeared for Plaintiff; Faith Whittaker and Lindsey Boyd appeared for Defendants. Parties requested the case to be referred to mediation. Calendar Order to Issue. (sct)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey N Boyd for Defendants Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc., Karla Walden, David Walsh (Boyd, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 12/27 2:58 PM
Notation Order: In light of this civil action's recent reassignment (Doc. 8), the preliminary pretrial conference set for 12/30/19 is hereby VACATED. Judge Cole's Chambers will contact the parties to reschedule the preliminary pretrial conference when and as appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/27/2019. (ss)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 12/20 9:53 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc., Karla Walden, David Walsh. (Whittaker, Faith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
8 8 6 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 12/11 9:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/11/2019. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
order Order Fri 11/22 4:09 PM
Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 12/30/2019 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/22/19. (rrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/21 4:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc., Karla Walden, David Walsh. (Whittaker, Faith)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/21 4:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Whittaker, Faith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/07 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc., Karla Walden, David Walsh. Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (cb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/06 2:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Karla Walden, David Walsh. Karla Walden served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019; David Walsh served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 10/29 12:07 PM
Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re:1 Complaint and2 Summons Issued. (cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Hospice of Southwest Ohio, Inc., Karla Walden, David Walsh. (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7158705), filed by Lamin Suwareh. (Bruce, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Right To Sue,
Att: 3 Summons Form Summons x 4
misc Docket Annotation Thu 10/17 2:52 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
Related: [-]