New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:19-cv-19090
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2019
Terminated:Jan 28, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 14, 2020 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
PERU FOOD IMPORTS, INC.
Plaintiff
NESTLE USA, INC.
Represented By
ROBERT J. SCHOENBERG
Riker, Danzig, Scherer, Hyland & Perretti, LLP
contact info
SCOTT A. OHNEGIAN
Riker, Danzig, Scherer, Hyland & Perretti, LLP
contact info
WENDI OPPER UZAR
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland Perretti LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 01/28 5:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), the parties hereby stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/28/2020. (sms)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 01/27 11:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by NESTLE USA, INC.. (OHNEGIAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 12:49 PM
STIPULATION OF CONSENT TO ADJOURNMENT; It is hereby stipulated and agreed, that Defendant Peru Food Imports Inc.'s time to answer or otherwise move with regard to the Complaint in this matter is currently due in this Court on November 11, 2019; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/13/2019. (sms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 11/12 12:29 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint by All Defendants. (GARCIA, GILBERTO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
9 9 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 11/05 1:17 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by NESTLE USA, INC.. (OHNEGIAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 11/05 1:16 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by NESTLE USA, INC.. PERU FOOD IMPORTS, INC. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (OHNEGIAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 11/05 1:14 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by NESTLE USA, INC.. PERU FOOD IMPORTS, INC. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (OHNEGIAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WENDI OPPER UZAR on behalf of NESTLE USA, INC. (UZAR, WENDI)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. SCHOENBERG on behalf of NESTLE USA, INC. (SCHOENBERG, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 9:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PERU FOOD IMPORTS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Fri 10/18 9:37 AM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/18 8:47 AM
Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 10/17 4:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NESTLE USA, INC. identifying Nestle Holdings, Inc. which is wholly owned by NIMCO US, Inc., which is wholly owned by Nestle US Holdco, Inc. which is wholly owned by Societe des Produits Nestle S.A., which is wholly owned by Nestle S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (OHNEGIAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against PERU FOOD IMPORTS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10043073) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NESTLE USA, INC..(OHNEGIAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons