California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dale A Drozd
Referred: Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:19-cv-01472
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2019
Terminated:Jan 25, 2021
Last checked: Monday Apr 13, 2020 3:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Prudential Security, Inc.
Represented By
John Thomas Egley
Call & Jensen, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Cowley
Represented By
David Christopher Leimbach
Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP
contact info
Carolyn H. Cottrell
Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns, LLP
contact info
Scott Lewis Gordon
Schneider Wallace
contact info

GPO Feb 21 2020
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2020. Pleading Amendment Deadline 7/1/2020. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 3/16/2020; Non-Expert 12/31/2020; Expert 3/15/2021. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Class Certification Motion filed by 9/30/2020. Conditional Certification FLSA Collection Motion filed by 5/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4. (Hall, S)
GPO May 19 2020
ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation to Request Relief from the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/19/2020. Motion for conditional certification of the FLSA due by 8/31/2020. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/1/2020. Motion for class certification due by 12/11/2020. (Hall, S)
GPO Jul 01 2020
ORDER AFTER MID-DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2020. (Hall, S)
GPO Jul 31 2020
ORDER After Further Mid-Discovery Status Conference; ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE; ORDER to DEFENSE COUNSEL to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for His Failure to Appear at the Conference and Comply with the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/31/2020. Show Cause Response due within 7 days. Further Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 02:00 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Motion for Conditional Certification of the FLSA: Filed by 10/30/2020; Opposition/Non-opposition by 11/4/2020; Reply by 12/18/2020; Motion Hearing CONTINUED to 1/15/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Hall, S)
GPO Aug 03 2020
ORDER DISCHARGING 27 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2020. (Hall, S)
GPO Aug 04 2020
STIPULATION and ORDER 31 to Administratively Adjust Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2020. (Hall, S)
GPO Sep 17 2020
ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference re: Discovery Dispute 43, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2020. (Hall, S)
GPO Oct 09 2020
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 50 Stipulation to Amend Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/8/2020. Hearing on motion to compel (Doc. 49) is CONTINUED to 11/30/2020 at 10:30 AM in Bakersfield before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
GPO Nov 04 2020
ORDER GRANTING 59 Continuance of Deadlines to Facilitate Transition of Defendant's Substitute Counsel and Allow Parties to Focus on Mediation Efforts, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/4/2020. (Hall, S)
GPO Dec 11 2020
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant the Motion to Transfer Venue 21, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/10/2020. Referred to District Judge. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
GPO Dec 29 2021
ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELECONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Docs. 76, 77); ORDER TERMINATING THE NOTICE OF MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Doc. 72), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/2020. (Apodaca, P)
GPO Jan 06 2021
ORDER DENYING 49 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/5/2021. (Hall, S)
GPO Jan 25 2021
ORDER adopting in full Findings and Recommendations to grant the Motion to Transfer Venue 67 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
misc Other Court Case Number Wed 03/03 12:28 PM
OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from Eastern District of Michigan case number 2:21-cv-10491. (Gonzalez, R)
Related: [-]