The Fiscal Court of Lewis County, Kentucky v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45889 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:31 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical
|
|
Defendant
ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
NORAMCO, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
MALLINCKRODT PLC,
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.,
|
|
Defendant
DEPOMED, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.,
|
|
Plaintiff
The Fiscal Court of Lewis County, Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Terminated: 11/06/2019
|
Docket last updated: 10/21/2019 2:40 PM EDT |
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 167 pgs Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9582919. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP . Filed by The Fiscal Court of Lewis County, Kentucky. (Guarnieri, David) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |