In Re Application of: iFinex Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:19-mc-00021 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 22, 2021 7:00 AM PDT |
In Re
Application of iFinex Inc.
|
|
Movant
iFinex Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Rondell Clyde Monroe
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
13
pgs
service
Subpoena (AO 88) Issued
Tue 12/10 12:01 PM
SUBPOENA IN A CIVIL CASE issued as to Rondell "Rhon" Clyde Monroe. (sbou) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 12/06 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,4(Lee, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Subpoena | ||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 11/15 3:49 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Granting Application to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 (Dkt.1 ) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The Court grants the Application, without prejudice to Monroe or any other interested party objecting to or moving to quash the subpoena. (See document for details.) (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 10/22 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/18 4:14 PM
APPLICATION to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Receipt No: 0973-24633496 - Fee: $400, filed by iFinex Inc. iFinex Inc.. (Attorney Michael Jason Lee added to party iFinex Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Lee, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Giancarlo Devasini |