Esso Exploration and Productio v. Nigerian National Petroleum Co
Original Case: 1:14-cv-08445
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03361 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 11, 2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Movant
The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Movant
National Foreign Trade Council
|
Represented By
|
Movant
National Association of Manufacturers
|
Represented By
|
Movant
American Petroleum Institute
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Chief Mike A.A. Ozekhome, a Nigerian constitutional lawyer at the firm Mike Ozekhomes Chambers and human rights activist
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Professor Offornze Amucheazi, the Managing Partner of Amucheazi, Ozioko & Co. in Abuja, a member of the law faculty at Nnamdi Azikiwe University, where he has been a member of the law faculty since 1999, and former Lead Technical Coordinator for the Nigeri
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Professor Ikponmwonsa Osahon Omoruyi, a Professor of Jurisprudence and International Law at the University of Benin in Benin City, Nigeria, whose scholarship is focused on, inter alia, Constitutional and International Law and Human Rights
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Professor George A. Bermann, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Nigerian Federal Ministry of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Federal Inland Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Federal Ministry of Finance, Budget and National Planning
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria Limited
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Shell Nigeria Exploration and Production Company Limited
|
Represented By
|
Respondent - Appellant
Nigerian National Petroleum Corporation
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 08 2022
OPINION, affirming in part, vacating in part and remanding the case for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, by RDS, SLC, R.KOVNER, FILED.[3344241] [19-3159, 19-3361] |
Docket last updated: 07/11/2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nigerian National Petroleum Corporation, FILED. [2681980] 19-3361 [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:40 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 32 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Nigerian National Petroleum Corporation, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17782637, FILED.[2681988] 19-3361 [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:43 PM] | |
3 | 3 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2681989] 19-3361 [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:44 PM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2681991] 19-3361 [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:45 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2681993] 19-3361 [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:45 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 32 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |