Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10210

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-ap-50539
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2019
Terminated:Sep 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cachet Creations, Inc.
111 Deer Run
Roslyn Heights, NY 11577
Represented By
Cachet Creations, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
CR Holding Liquidating, Inc., et al.,
5910 Pacific Center Blvd. Suite 120
San Diego, CA 92121
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Edward E Neiger
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/21 3:41 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50539 Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/19 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/19 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
14 14 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 02/16 9:31 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Cachet Creations, Inc. dba Cristals. Related [+] Tickle due by: 3/2/2021. Signed on 2/16/2021. (BJM)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/16 9:29 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Cachet Creations, Inc. dba Cristals. Related [+] Signed on 2/16/2021. (BJM)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, February 11, 2021
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 02/11 2:13 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 11 11
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgment By Default
11 11 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 02/11 2:10 PM
Request for Entry of Default Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
10 10 6 pgs order Order Wed 04/01 7:02 PM
Order Plaintiffs Motion to Extend All Deadlines In Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings by Ninety (90) Days Signed on 4/1/2020 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 01/16 4:15 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Brogan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/16 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 01/10 12:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Second Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 542, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
6 6 notice Hearing - Notice Tue 12/17 3:29 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing and Response Date for Motion and Defendants' Election as to Procedures Order Track Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/6/2020. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Tue 11/19 2:23 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 542, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Tue 10/29 11:55 AM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 542, 547, 548, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/12/2019. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 10/25 2:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Cachet Creations, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/24/2019. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Saturday, October 19, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 10/19 5:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50539 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9493021, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 10/18 1:16 PM
Adversary case 19-50539 Complaint by CR Holding Liquidating, Inc.,et al., against Cachet Creations, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives