Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-14564

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:19-ap-01104
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2019
Terminated:Mar 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
JOEL MOLINA, AN INDIVIDUAL
9136 WINE CELLAR AVENUE
LAS VEGAS, NV 89148
Represented By
JOEL MOLINA
contact info
Defendant
THE FORTALEZA GROUP, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
2451 S. BUFFALO DR, STE #145
LAS VEGAS, NV 89417
Represented By
THE FORTALEZA GROUP, LLC
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
2451 S. BUFFALO DR. SUITE #133
LAS VEGAS, NV 89417
Represented By
NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
LARSON ZIRZOW KAPLIN & COTTNER 850 E. BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW
Larson Zirzow Kaplan & Cottner LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DIEGO MACHAIN, AN INDIVIDUAL
850 E. BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW
Larson Zirzow Kaplan & Cottner LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/10 1:27 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
23 23 adv_misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/28 9:08 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN,22 Notice of Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
22 22 notice Entry of Default Fri 02/28 9:04 AM
Notice of Entry of Default Judgment Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+](ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 19 Default Judgment.
21 21 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Fri 02/28 9:01 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+](ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion for Default Judgment.
Thursday, February 27, 2020
19 19 orderad Default Judgment Thu 02/27 1:39 PM
Default Judgment Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN,11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
18 18 order Default Judgment Thu 02/27 8:10 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
17 17 notice Notice (Adv) Wed 02/26 12:40 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Its Second and Third Claims for Relief Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+](ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
16 16 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Ruling of the Court (ADV) Wed 02/26 12:12 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 02/27/2020 10:00 am. Vacated Per Ruling of the Court at the 2/26/2020 Hearing Related [+] (brr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN
Monday, January 27, 2020
15 15 adv_misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN,12 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN,13 Declaration filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
14 14 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Mon 01/27 10:13 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 2/26/2020 at 09:30 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
Friday, January 24, 2020
13 13 adv_misc Declaration Fri 01/24 3:23 PM
Declaration Of: DIEGO MACHAIN Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
12 12 notice Hearing (Adv) Fri 01/24 1:58 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 2/26/2020 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+](ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
11 11 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/24 1:57 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against: JOEL MOLINA, THE FORTALEZA GROUP, and NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
10 10 adv_misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 3:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 7 Request/Praecipe for Default filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN,8 Affidavit filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
9 9 orderad Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 12/04 8:40 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 7 Request/Praecipe for Default filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
Monday, December 02, 2019
8 8 adv_misc Affidavit Mon 12/02 2:41 PM
Affidavit Of: MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW, ESQ. Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 7 Request/Praecipe for Default filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 and 2
7 7 adv_misc Request/Praecipe for Default Mon 12/02 2:38 PM
Request/Praecipe for Default against JOEL MOLINA, THE FORTALEZA GROUP, LLC, and NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW). Related document(s)6 Summons Service Executed filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN. Modified on 12/3/2019 to also relate to dkt #6 (Penn, VA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/23 11:28 AM
Summons Service Executed on JOEL MOLINA 10/23/2019; NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC 10/23/2019; THE FORTALEZA GROUP, LLC 10/23/2019 Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC ; DIEGO MACHAIN Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN,5 Summons Issued.
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 10/22 1:23 PM
Summons Issued on JOEL MOLINA , NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC , THE FORTALEZA GROUP, LLC (cly)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 10/22 1:22 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, Plaintiff DIEGO MACHAIN.
Friday, October 18, 2019
3 3 cmp Request to Issue Summons Fri 10/18 3:47 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: JOEL MOLINA, NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC, THE FORTALEZA GROUP. Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Fri 10/18 3:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 19-01104 mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 19170094, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 3:44 PM
Adversary case 19-01104 Complaint Filed by FUSION HOLDINGS LLC, DIEGO MACHAIN vs. JOEL MOLINA, THE FORTALEZA GROUP, NATIONAL FORECLOSURE ADVOCATES, LLC Fee Amount $350. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)(ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]