Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Patricia L Dodge
Case #: 2:19-cv-01348
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2019
Terminated:Nov 18, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 18, 2020 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
BROOKVILLE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By
Christopher M. Moreland
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Trisha A. Gill
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Mediator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info
Plaintiff
RODNEY M. BECK
Represented By
John E. Black, III
Rothman Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Samuel J. Cordes
Rothman Gordon, P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 02 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BROOKVILLE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/2/2021. (mqe)

Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Friday, November 19, 2021
69 69 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/19 4:37 PM
ORDER re68 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by RODNEY M. BECK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/19/2021. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
68 68 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Thu 11/18 10:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by RODNEY M. BECK. (Cordes, Samuel)
Related: [-]