Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Arthur J Schwab
Case #: 2:19-cv-01359
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2019
Terminated:May 21, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Apr 19, 2020 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
DENNIS ALLISON
Represented By
Richard J. Cromer
Leech, Tishman, Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info
Erica M. Pietranton
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC
contact info
Mediator
ARTHUR H. STROYD
Represented By
Arthur H. Stroyd, Jr.
Del Sole Cavanaugh Stroyd LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLEGHENY CRANE RENTAL, INC.
Represented By
Tiffany A. Jenca
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Bethany C. Salvatore
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Thomas S. Giotto
Cozen O'Connor
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, May 21, 2020
64 64 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/21 10:37 AM
ORDER granting61 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/21/20. (bfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
63 63 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/20 6:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re61 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by DENNIS ALLISON. (Pietranton, Erica)
Related: [-]
62 62 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 05/20 2:23 PM
BRIEF in Support re61 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by ALLEGHENY CRANE RENTAL, INC.. (Salvatore, Bethany)
Related: [-]
61 61 motion Dismiss Wed 05/20 2:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by ALLEGHENY CRANE RENTAL, INC.. (Salvatore, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, May 17, 2020
notice Notice re NextGen Sun 05/17 7:49 AM
FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found[LINK:here] . Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's[LINK:administrative order] for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
Related: [-]