VENSON v. PRO CUSTOM SOLAR LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Esther Salas |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-19227 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Feb 02, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 19, 2020 6:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
BRIAN ALPER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFREY ANCLIEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PRO CUSTOM SOLAR LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK VENSON
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
ADAM GUGINO
Terminated: 01/06/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEX SHEIKH
Terminated: 01/06/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |