County of Jim Wells v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45884 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:19-cv-03580 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:33 PM EST |
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Jim Wells
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/29/2019 11:26 AM EDT |
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 201949073 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23226017) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 112 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 DOCKETED IN ERROR. MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.(Fibich, Kenneth) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by CVS Healthcare Corporation for a Temporary Stay Pending Transfer , filed by County of Jim Wells.(Fibich, Kenneth) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 Corrected MOTION for Confidential Treatment of file earlier as "agreed" which was not correct( Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.), Corrected MOTION for Entry of Order re: Motion to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. (Henderson, Jay) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
5 | 5 MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.(Henderson, Jay) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7 24 pgs MEMORANDUM In Support of re:6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed.(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER entered: CVS's motion to stay, (Docket Entry No. 6), is granted. The motion to remand, (Docket Entry No. 5), is denied, without prejudice to reassertion.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-114) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-03580. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |