California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:19-cv-09129
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2019
Terminated:Mar 16, 2022
Last checked: Monday Apr 20, 2020 1:42 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Ravi R Ranganath
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Saina S Shamilov
Fenwick And West
contact info
Christine Jimin Ko
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
J David Hadden
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ceiva Logic, Inc.
Represented By
Gary Alan Hecker
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Jamil N Alibhai
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Chad J Ray
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Goss
Wang Ip Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 17, 2022
207 207 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 03/17 1:49 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Minutes of 3/16/2022
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
206 206 order Join in Complaint Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event) Thu 03/17 12:56 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO JOIN OR SUBSTITUTE CEIV A OPCO, LLC AND TO AMEND COMPLAINT (DKT. NO. 172), AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(l) AND 12(c) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court finds that Plaintiff lacks constitutional standing to assert the Patents-in-Suit and GRANTS Defendant's motion to dismiss177 without prejudice. The Court also DENIES Plaintiff's motion to join or substitute Ceiva Opco, LLC for Plaintiff in this matter172 . This case is now closed. See document for further details. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
Related: [-]