Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-06716
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2019
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 8:19-cv-02040
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 15, 2020 2:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dunlap Gary
Represented By
Genevieve Katherine Chambers
Morgan And Morgan, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2019
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/13 2:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/13 2:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/13 2:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
utility MDL Member Case Fri 10/25 8:05 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Middle District of Florida, 19-02040 Gary, Dunlap, opened in California Northern District as 19-06716 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 155 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 10/23 9:47 AM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-02040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
11 11 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California re MDL case number: 2741. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2019
10 10 RETURN of service executed on 9/17/19 by Dunlap Gary as to Monsanto Company. (Chambers, G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
9 9 COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT CODE (SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED.) PROOF of service by Dunlap Gary (Chambers, G.) Modified on 9/19/2019 (BSN).
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
8 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Dunlap Gary. (Chambers, G.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
7 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dunlap Gary. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
Related: [-]
6 6 TERMINATED. CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Dunlap Gary. (Chambers, G.) NOTE: Notice missing caption, counsel notified. Modified on 9/4/2019 (LD).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
5 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/20/2019. (JCG)
Related: [-]
4 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/20/2019. (JCG)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
3 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (LD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2040-T-35SPF. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15812739) filed by Dunlap Gary.(Chambers, G.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons