AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. v. DEMAIO HOLDING INC, et al.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Edward S Kiel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-19274 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Jun 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 21, 2020 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED
1247 State Route 10
Cedar Knolls, NJ 07927 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, February 18, 2022 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 02/18 4:52 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. against DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED, CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/18/2022. (jd) |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Letter
Fri 02/11 6:40 PM
Letter re43 Stipulation and Order, Judgment.(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Judgment | ||
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order Judgment
Tue 02/08 5:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF JUDGMENT in favor of GMF against and against Defendants, jointly and severally. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/8/2022. (jd) |
|
Monday, February 07, 2022 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/07 9:58 PM
STIPULATION by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC..(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 06/29 12:07 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/29/2021. (ams, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Tue 04/13 4:31 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 6/14/2021. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/13/2021. (ams, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 04/13 8:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/13/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 03/18 9:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: The telephonic settlement conference set for March 18, 2021 is rescheduled to April 13, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. Trial counsel as well as persons with full settlement authority must attend the settlement conference. Each party shall submit, by email to ESK_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than ten double spaced pages no later than five business days before the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/18/2021. (as, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 03/17 11:54 AM
Letter from David W. Phillips, Esq. (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/26 9:49 AM
TEXT ORDER: A telephonic settlement conference is set for March 18, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. Trial counsel as well as persons with full settlement authority must attend the settlement conference. Each party shall submit, by email to ESK_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than ten double spaced pages no later than five business days before the conference. Defendant is granted leave to take the deposition of plaintiff's expert by February 26, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/26/2021. (as, ) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 01/26 9:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/25/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 01/20 11:37 AM
Letter from David W. Phillips, Esq. (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 01/11 2:25 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re Liability. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/11/2021. (ams, ) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Fri 01/08 1:11 PM
Letter from Plaintiff with proposed order regarding liability.(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 01/06 6:54 PM
Proposed Order on Liability by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. re32 Letter. (BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Wed 01/06 6:50 PM
Letter from Plaintiff regarding stipulation and order on liability.(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/26 3:17 PM
ORDER scheduling Telephone Status Conference for 1/25/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Fact discovery is extended through 12/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/26/2020. (ams, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 10/26 4:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/26/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/10 4:39 PM
ORDER that a Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 10/26/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Fact discovery is extended through 10/30/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/10/2020. (ams, ) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Mon 08/10 2:01 PM
Letter from David W. Phillips, Esq. (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 08/11 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/10/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/11 4:52 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Fact discovery is extended through 7/17/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/11/2020. (ams, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 05/12 7:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/11/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order
Thu 05/07 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to Judge Kiel's procedures for civil case conferences (https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/JudgeKielCOVIDProcedures.pdf) until further notice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/7/2020. (as, ) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/23 10:25 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. re24 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Attachment and restraints ,23 MOTION to Vacate22 Order to Show Cause, (BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration of H. Ravitz, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Declaration of D Blankenship, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of R. Brener | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
misc
Bond
Thu 04/23 4:20 PM
Surety BOND in the amount of $ 200,000 posted by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. (ams, ) |
|
Att: 1 Power of Attorney, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
24 | 24
5
pgs
motion
Writ
Thu 04/23 2:43 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Attachment and restraints by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC..(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration H. Ravitz, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ravitz Exh. A, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit Ravitz Exh. B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ravitz Exh. C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ravitz Exh. D, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration R. Brener, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Brener Exh. A, | ||
Att: 8 18 pgs Exhibit Brener Exh. B, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Brener Exh. C, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Brener Exh. D, | ||
Att: 11 38 pgs Brief | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/23 2:28 PM
Set Deadlines as to23 MOTION to Vacate22 Order to Show Cause, . Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/23 3:40 PM
Set Deadlines as to24 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Attachment and restraints . Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
motion
Vacate
Tue 04/21 6:44 PM
MOTION to Vacate22 Order to Show Cause, by CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III.(PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 27 pgs Brief In support of motion, | ||
Att: 2 161 pgs Certification David W. Phillips, | ||
Att: 3 6 pgs Certification Carmine Demaio, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 04/15 2:22 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Enjoin with Temporary Restraints and for Issuance of a Writ of Attachment, etc.; Opposition to the Order to Show Cause shall be filed and served by 4/21/2020; Reply to the Opposition shall be filed and served by 4/23/2020. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/15/2020. (ams, ) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 03/23 3:21 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is set for 5/11/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Please mark your calendars accordingly. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/23/2020. (as, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 03/31 12:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/25 10:00 AM
TEXT ORDER: The status conference set for 3/16/2020 is rescheduled and converted to a telephone status conference on 3/23/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The teleconference shall be initiated by the plaintiff such that the plaintiff will arrange for all parties to be on one line before calling into Chambers. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/25/2020. (as, ) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 02/21 2:29 PM
Letter from David W. Phillips, Esq. (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/20 2:15 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newark -Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/30/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/19/2019. (ams, ) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 12/23 8:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
10
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/02 5:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III, DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED.(PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 11/13 9:29 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III, DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/2/2019. (dam, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Tue 11/12 5:45 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants DeMaio Holdings Inc. and Carmine DeMaio III's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.. (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 11/06 10:12 AM
LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/6/2019. (as, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/06 9:52 AM
ORDER granting13 GMF's Letter request to withdraw the pending Order to Show Cause, and that GMF seeks a Rule 16 conference at the Court's earliest convenience. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/5/19. (lag, ) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 11/05 11:20 AM
Letter from AmeriCredit Financial Services Inc. re9 Order,. (BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/01 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID W. PHILLIPS on behalf of CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III, DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 11/01 5:53 PM
Letter. (PHILLIPS, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 10/29 1:23 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez, Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/29/19. (ak, ) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/25 6:06 PM
ORDER granting in part the application for TRO. Any opposition to the Order to Show Cause shall be filed and served by 11/1/19, any reply is due on or before 11/6/19, and this matter is returnable before the undersigned on 11/8/19 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/25/19. (ro, ) |
|
8 | 8
4
pgs
misc
Declaration
Fri 10/25 4:41 PM
DECLARATION of Robert J. Brener re2 Application/Petition by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.. (BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
7 | 7
6
pgs
misc
Declaration
Fri 10/25 3:05 PM
DECLARATION of Howie Ravitz re2 Application/Petition by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC..(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 8 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 5 pgs Exhibit | ||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/25 11:47 AM
ORDER, that Plaintiff's application for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED without prejudice and it is further Ordered that after Defendants are served in this matter the Court will set a schedule for Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/24/2019. (JB, ) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 10/24 8:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status Conference held on 10/24/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/24 2:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CARMINE A. DEMAIO, III, DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 10/24 2:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: Scheduling a telephone conference for today, October 24, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. regarding the pending application for TRO. Counsel shall initiate the call and provide dial-in information if applicable. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/24/19. (ro, ) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
misc
Application/Petition
Thu 10/24 7:34 AM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Injunctive Relief for by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. d/b/a GM FINANCIAL.(BRENER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Brief | ||
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/24 7:27 AM
COMPLAINT against CARMINE A DEMAIO, DEMAIO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10056679), filed by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.(BRENER, ROBERT) Modified on 10/24/2019 (dam, ). |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Master Loan Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit Term Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit UCC Financing Statement, | ||
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit Guaranty, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Demand, | ||
Att: 6 8 pgs Exhibit List of Unpaid/Missing Vehicles | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 10/24 10:39 AM
Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps, ) |