City of Brent, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45910 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 7:19-cv-01565 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:34 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Brent, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/29/2019 12:54 PM EDT |
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Brent, Alabama.(PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by City of Brent, Alabama (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by City of Brent, Alabama. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3439232 (ALND B4601100743) related document1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Brent, Alabama.(PSM). (Sutton, William) Modified on 9/23/2019 (KEK). [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | ||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by H Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
8 | 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Brent, Alabama. Actavis LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Brent, Alabama. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Johnson & Johnson served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Noramco Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Brent, Alabama. Cardinal Health Inc served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Cephalon Inc (green card not signed or dated) served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Purdue Pharma Inc (green card signed, not dated) served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by City of Brent, Alabama as to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Strubel, J) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk emailed to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 7:19-cv-01565. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |