New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:19-cv-09899
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2019
Terminated:Sep 18, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 22, 2020 5:13 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Peter S Bruckel
Represented By
Melanie Slaughter Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Counter Claimant
P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,
Represented By
Melanie Slaughter Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Counter Defendant
Peter S Bruckel
Represented By
Melanie Slaughter Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,
Represented By
Melanie Slaughter Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Defendant
Peter S Bruckel
Represented By
Melanie Slaughter Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Defendant
Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Robert Mark Dunn
Devliger Hilser, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,
Represented By
Melanie Slaughter Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806
Represented By
Dana Lynne Henke
Barnes, Iaccarino, & Shepherd, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Darwin National Assurance Company
Terminated: 01/17/2020
Represented By
Robert Mark Dunn
Devliger Hilser, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
44 44 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/14 12:47 PM
ORDER entered43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: The period set forth in Doc. 42 is extended to 12/2/20. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Extension of Time Wed 10/14 12:20 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Dana L. Henke dated October 14, 2020. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds..(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
42 42 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Fri 09/18 12:50 PM
ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the claims in this case have been settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is discontinued without prejudice and costs; provided, however, that if settlement is not consummated within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may apply by letter within the thirty-day period for restoration of the action to the Calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/18/2020) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
minutes Status Conference Fri 09/18 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Status Conference held on 9/17/2020. Plaintiffs' counsel Dana Henke, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant P.S. Bruckel, Inc. counsel Melanie Wolk appears telephonically. Defendant Allied World Specialty Insurance Company counsel Robert Dunn, Esq. appears telephonically. The parties inform the Court that there are extremely close to a resolution of the case. The Court will issue a thirty (30) day Order without prejudice. See transcript. (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
minutes Case Management Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/05 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Case Management Conference held on 7/30/2020. Plaintiff's counsel Dana Henke, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant P.S. Bruckel, Inc. counsel Melanie Wolk, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant Allied World Specialty Insurance Company counsel Robert Dunn, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Max Bernstein appears telephonically. The parties inform the Court that strides have been made in getting resolutions done in the case. The Court schedules the next status conference for September 17, 2020 at 12:30 p.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by September 3, 2020; opposition due September 10, 2020. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Christina Arends-Dieck) (wc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
41 41 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 07/17 9:46 AM
NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF TIME OF CONFERENCE: The Case Management Conference previously scheduled before this Court for July 30, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. will be held at 12:00 p.m. (same date) at the United States District Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601 in Courtroom 621. Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel..(mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
40 40 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/29 1:56 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to my Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, last revised March 19, 2020, all parties to civil conferences shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 1047966. The parties should call in from a landline, announce their names before speaking, and mute their lines when not speaking. This Order is subject to revocation at any time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/29/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
39 39 misc Status Report Thu 04/23 2:04 PM
STATUS REPORT. Correspondence to Judge Seibel Document filed by Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,..(Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
38 38 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/13 11:09 AM
AMENDED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is not to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 6/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 7/27/2020. Expert Discovery due by 9/14/2020. Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. This case has been designated to the Honorable Lisa M. Smith, United States Magistrate Judge, for discovery disputes if the Court is unavailable. Upon both parties signing a Consent for Trial Before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) (available on the Court's website), the Magistrate Judge may amend this Plan and Order, and will, at the appropriate time, set a date certain for trial. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/13/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/13 10:12 AM
ORDER granting36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: I will enter the proposed amended scheduling order. The next conference will be 7/30/20 at 11 am. Any party contemplating a motion at that time shall submit a pre-motion letter of no more than 3 pages by 7/16/20, and the opposing party or parties shall respond, also by letter of no more than 3 pages, by 7/23/20. If nobody is contemplating a motion at that time, and no other purpose would be served by the conference, the parties may so notify the Court, and the conference will be rescheduled for after the close of expert discovery. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
36 36 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/12 8:49 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Robert M. Dunn dated March 12, 2020. Document filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company..(Dunn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
35 35 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 02/26 9:00 AM
ANSWER to30 Counterclaim. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds..(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
34 34 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/25 2:32 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allied World Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.), Inc., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings AG, Corporate Parent AW Underwriters, Inc. f/k/a Darwin Professional Underwriters, Inc. for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company..(Dunn, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 02/25 1:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Mark Dunn to RE-FILE Document 33 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. ERROR(S): The wrong filer was selected. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
33 33 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/24 10:28 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allied World Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AW Underwriters, Inc., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc.,, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings AG for Darwin National Assurance Company. Document filed by Darwin National Assurance Company..(Dunn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Fri 02/21 10:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Mark Dunn to RE-FILE Document 32 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
32 32 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/19 12:27 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company..(Dunn, Robert)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/19 12:20 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Darwin National Assurance Company..(Dunn, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Tue 02/18 4:43 PM
ANSWER to24 Amended Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds. Document filed by Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,..(Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
29 29 service Affidavit of Service Other Thu 02/06 4:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint and Summons served on Allied World Specialty Company a/k/a Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, LTD Darwin National Assurance Company on February 3, 2020. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds..(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
28 28 service Amended Summons Issued Wed 01/29 3:37 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,. (pc)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 3:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
26 26 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 01/28 2:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to P.S. Bruckel, Inc. and Peter S. Bruckel, re:24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/28 2:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allied World Specialty Company a/k/a Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company, re:24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 01/22 4:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dana Lynne Henke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 3:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,, against Allied World Specialty Insurance Company a/k/a Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd, Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,.Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. Related document:1 Complaint,,.(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 01/17 2:55 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dana Lynne Henke to RE-FILE Document No. 21 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/17 2:59 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dana Lynne Henke to RE-FILE Document No. 22 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; a new summons must be requested for new parties and an Amended Summons must be request for parties whom a summons has been previously issued for; summons request could not be processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons and Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/16 5:26 PM
CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is not to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 4/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/16/2020) (mml)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Thu 01/16 4:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to P.S. Bruckel, Inc. and Peter S. Bruckel, Individually and Allied World Specialty Company a/k/a Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd f/k/a Darwin National Assurance Company, re:21 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 4:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,, against Allied World Specialty Insurance Company a/k/a Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd, Peter S Bruckel, Darwin National Assurance Company, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,.Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. Related document:1 Complaint,,.(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 3:48 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,, against Darwin National Assurance Company, Allied World Specialty Insurance Company a/k/a Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd.Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. Related document:1 Complaint,,.(Henke, Dana) Modified on 1/16/2020 (jgo)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/16 3:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 1/16/2020. Defendants' counsel appears telephonically. Case Management Plan is signed. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend Complaint (for purposes of substituting the proper name of the insurance Defendant) and re-serve on Defendant(s). Pre-motion letter(s) to be submitted by June 16, 2020; opposition due June 23, 2020. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
19 19 service Acknowledgment of Service Complaints Tue 01/14 12:06 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/13 8:14 AM
NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF TIME OF CONFERENCE: The Initial Conference previously scheduled before this Court for January 16, 2020 at 2:45 p.m. will be held at 2:15 p.m. (same date) at the United States District Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601 in Courtroom 621. (Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
17 17 order Memo Endorsement Tue 01/07 12:45 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:16 Letter filed by Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: I do my conferences on the record, and phone conferences make life difficult for the court reporter. But as Ms. Wolk is located in Rochester and it is just a scheduling conference, she may appear by phone (landline only), provided the parties confer on a case management plan and provide their proposal to the Court in advance. Ms. Wolk should contact my courtroom deputy, Walter Clark (914-390-4077 or walter_clark@nysd.uscourts.gov) to make arrangements. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/7/2020) (mml)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Letter Tue 01/07 10:02 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Melanie S. Wolk dated January 7, 2020 re: Request for Appearance by Phone. Document filed by Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,.(Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 01/06 2:01 PM
ANSWER to13 Counterclaim., COUNTERCLAIM against Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund.(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 12/20 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on January 16, 2020 at 2:45 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 12/19 3:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds. Document filed by Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,.(Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/19 3:10 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,.(Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 11/22 2:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Peter S Bruckel served on 11/7/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. Service was accepted by Sharon "Doe", Step-Daughter/Co-Occupant of Peter S. Bruckel. Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds; The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806; Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund; Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/18 3:53 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Peter S Bruckel and P.S. Bruckel, Inc. may have until 12/19/2019 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/18 1:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, . Document filed by Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,.(Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/18 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Slaughter Wolk on behalf of Peter S Bruckel, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,. (Wolk, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 11/01 12:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Darwin National Assurance Company served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds; The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806; Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund; Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 11/01 12:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. P.S. Bruckel, Inc., served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds; The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806; Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund; Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 10/28 12:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter S Bruckel, Darwin National Assurance Company, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/28 12:33 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 10/28 12:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/28 12:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 3:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds.(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/25 3:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/25 3:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to P.S. Bruckel, Inc. and Peter S. Bruckel, Individually and Darwain National Assurance Company, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds. (Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Peter S Bruckel, Darwin National Assurance Company, P.S. Bruckel, Inc.,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17835759)Document filed by Trustees of the Local 806 Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Employee Trust Funds, The Structural Steel and Bridge Painters of Greater New York Local Union No. 806, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund.(Henke, Dana)
Related: [-]