Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:19-bk-12284
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2019
Terminated:Jun 10, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Dec 10, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Zumobi, Inc., Zumobi, Inc.
251 Little Falls Dr
Wilmington, DE 19808-1674
Represented By
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
132 132 misc Post-Confirmation Report Wed 06/10 4:34 PM
Post-Confirmation Report --Post-Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report Filed by Jeremy P VanEtten. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 06/10 12:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
131 131 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 06/08 2:37 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Distribution Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
130 130 order Final Decree Mon 06/08 12:10 PM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case Related [+] Order Signed on 6/8/2020. (LJH)
Related: [-] 126 ,128
129 129 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Mon 06/08 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Distribution Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
128 128 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 06/04 4:53 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Proposed Form of Order Regarding Distribution Trustee's Motion for Entry of Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case Related [+] Filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Distribution Trustee. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-] 126
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B