Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Janet T Neff
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:19-cv-00899
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2019
Terminated:Jul 20, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 22, 2020 4:45 AM EDT
defendant
Kelloggsville Public Schools
Represented By
Mark T. Ostrowski
Kluczynski Girtz & Vogelzang
contact info
Bogomir Rajsic, III
Kluczynski Girtz & Vogelzang
contact info
plaintiff
Juan Rolon
Represented By
Robert Anthony Alvarez
Avanti Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 20, 2020
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/20 7:38 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting STIPULATION30 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice, and without costs or attorney fees; closing the case; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
30 30 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents) Fri 07/17 11:06 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
29 29 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents) Tue 07/14 4:11 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal by plaintiff Juan Rolon (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
28 28 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Mon 06/29 2:43 PM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be submitted by 7/27/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Early Settlement Conference Mon 06/29 2:42 PM
MINUTES of early settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; case is settled; order to issue (Portions Digitally Recorded) (cbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
26 26 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Mon 06/22 10:59 AM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for the same date but starting at 2:00 PM and in person; early settlement conference set for 6/29/2020 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
25 25 trial Witness List Thu 05/28 10:35 AM
Defendant's Expert WITNESS LIST by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools (Rajsic, Bogomir)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
24 24 2 pgs order Order Regarding Settlement Conference Tue 05/26 4:35 PM
ORDER regarding settlement conference: continued early settlement conference set for 6/29/2020 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Early Settlement Conference Tue 05/26 4:34 PM
MINUTES of early settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; conference to be continued (Proceedings Not Recorded) (cbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
22 22 service Proof of Service Thu 05/07 12:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools for Proof of Service for Notice of Taking Deposition (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
21 21 2 pgs order Order Regarding Settlement Conference Wed 03/25 11:11 AM
ORDER regarding settlement conference: early settlement conference rescheduled to 5/26/2020 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/25 11:08 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION19 to reschedule early settlement conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Wed 03/25 10:03 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to adjourn early settlement conference19 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
19 19 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 03/24 3:35 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Adjourn Early Settlement Conference by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools (Rajsic, Bogomir)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
18 18 service Proof of Service Wed 02/26 9:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Juan Rolon for Plaintiffs Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
17 17 service Proof of Service Tue 02/25 11:29 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools for Notice of Taking Deposition of Juan Rolon (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
16 16 service Proof of Service Tue 02/18 9:20 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools for Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
15 15 service Proof of Service Tue 02/11 3:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools for Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
14 14 order Case Management Order Wed 01/22 3:46 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: early settlement conference set for 4/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Wed 01/22 3:02 PM
MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: not recorded) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
12 12 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Thu 01/16 10:54 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2019
11 11 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Sat 12/21 1:07 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/22/2020 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 1/15/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 11:34 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Kelloggsville Public Schools (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 11/21 12:56 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bogomir Rajsic, III on behalf of defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools (Rajsic, Bogomir)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 11/20 8:48 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark T. Ostrowski on behalf of defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools (Ostrowski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 2:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Juan Rolon as to Kelloggsville Public Schools waiver sent on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2019
8 8 misc Notice Regarding Reassignment (ESC) Mon 11/04 10:13 AM
NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under[LINK:Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093] , Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (asm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 9:09 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kelloggsville Public Schools (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/28 1:48 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (jal)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/28 1:47 PM
NOTICE re In Forma Pauperis by plaintiff Juan Rolon (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 10/28 12:32 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
3 3 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Fri 10/25 8:10 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Fri 10/25 8:09 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 8:06 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kelloggsville Public Schools, Grand Rapids, MI filed by Juan Rolon (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A