Arizona District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-08237
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2019 12:28 AM MST
Defendant
Sevastian Cavada (2)
Represented By
Sarah Kosnoff Erlinder
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Flagstaff, Az
contact info
Defendant
Marco Antonio Cuevas (3)
Represented By
William James Schnebly
contact info
Defendant
Mikaela Marie Cuevas (1)
Represented By
William James Schnebly
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul V Stearns
Us Attorneys Office - Flagstaff, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/27/2019 12:53 AM MST
Friday, September 06, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mikaela Marie Cuevas (1), Sevastian Cavada (2), Marco Antonio Cuevas (3). (CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
Arrest of Mikaela Marie Cuevas, Sevastian Cavada, Marco Antonio Cuevas in District of Nevada. (CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Sevastian Cavada in Nevada. (MAP) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William James Schnebly appearing for Mikaela Marie Cuevas . (Schnebly, William) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William James Schnebly appearing for Marco Antonio Cuevas . (Schnebly, William) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
7 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant filed by Marco Antonio Cuevas,5 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant filed by Mikaela Marie Cuevas. Document not in compliance with LRCrim 12.1(a) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
8 8 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from the District of Nevada as to Sevastian Cavada. (MAP) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Sevastian Cavada. (Originally filed in the District of Nevada on 9/20/19) (MAP) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
10 10 Appearance Bond/ ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE Entered as to Sevastian Cavada. Singed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/19. (Originally filed in the District of Nevada on 9/20/19) (MAP) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release OW RECOGNIZANCE as to Mikaela Marie Cuevas. Signed by Judge in District of Nevada on 9/20/19.(CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release on OWN RECOGNIZANCE as to Marco Antonio Cuevas. Signed by Magistrate Judge in District of Nevada on 9/20/19.(CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
13 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles: Initial Appearance as to Mikaela Marie Cuevas held on 9/27/2019. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing held on 9/27/2019. Defendant continued released on own recognizance with conditions issued by the District of Nevada with the addition to contact attorney each week. Appearances : AUSA Patrick Schneider for Paul Stearns for the Government. Retained attorney William Schnebly for defendant. Defendant is present and released. Status Hearing possible change of plea set for 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bureau of Land Management Building, 2755 Mission Blvd. Kingman, AZ 86401 before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. Related [+] Hearing held 10:03 am to 10:10 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
14 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles: Initial Appearance as to Sevastian Cavada held on 9/27/2019. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Sarah Kosnoff Erlinder for defendant with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing held on 9/27/2019. Defendant continued released on own recognizance with conditions with the addition to contact attorney each week. Appearances : AUSA Patrick Schneider for Paul Stearns for the Government. AFPD Sarah Erlinder for defendant. Defendant is present and released. Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bureau of Land Management Building, 2755 Mission Blvd. Kingman, AZ 86401 before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. Related [+] Hearing held 10:10 am to 10:14 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
15 15 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Sevastian Cavada. (CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-]
17 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles: Initial Appearance as to Marco Antonio Cuevas held on 9/27/2019. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing held on 9/27/2019. Defendant continued released on own recognizance with conditions issued by District of Nevada with the addition to contact attorney each week. Appearances : AUSA Patrick Schneider for Paul Stearns for the Government. Retained attorney William Schnebly for defendant. Defendant is present and released. Status Hearing possible change of plea set for 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bureau of Land Management Building, 2755 Mission Blvd. Kingman, AZ 86401 before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. Related [+] Hearing held 10:14 am to 10:18 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CSH) [3:19-mj-04244-CDB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
18 18 INFORMATION - Class A Misdemeanor as to Mikaela Marie Cuevas (1) count(s) 1, 2, 6, Sevastian Cavada (2) count(s) 3, 4, 6, Marco Antonio Cuevas (3) count(s) 5-6. (CSH)
Related: [-]