California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Referred: Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:19-cv-07071
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Apr 25, 2020 2:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Domain ID Shield Service Co., Limited
Represented By
Perry J. Narancic
Lexanalytica, PC
contact info
Defendant
OnLineNic Inc
Represented By
Perry J. Narancic
Lexanalytica, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Facebook, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Erick Lauridsen
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Howard Alan Kroll
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
David Jefferson Steele
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Instagram, LLC
Represented By
Steven Erick Lauridsen
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Howard Alan Kroll
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
David Jefferson Steele
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 28 2020
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/28/2020. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
GPO Feb 14 2020
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/14/2020. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
GPO Feb 14 2020
STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/14/2020. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
GPO Feb 18 2020
ORDER granting 33 STIPULATED FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(D) ORDER AND CLAWBACK AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/18/2020. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
GPO May 27 2020
ORDER GRANTING 38 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO AMEND PLEADINGS. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 05/27/2020. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
GPO Oct 28 2021
REFERRAL ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
GPO Jan 18 2022
ORDER DENYING XIAMEN TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT denying 174 Motion to Dismiss; granting 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 195 Motion to Strike 174 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 195 MOTION to Strike 184 Notice (Other), of Joinder,. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
GPO Apr 05 2022
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT 35.CN'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE denying 213 Motion to Bifurcate. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
GPO Aug 16 2022
DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse Re: Dkts. 247, 257. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
GPO Dec 06 2022
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving 280 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
GPO Dec 16 2022
ORDER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
GPO Jun 06 2023
ORDER RE: -MOTION TO STRIKE; -35.CN'S SUR-REPLY; AND -HEARING DATE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
GPO Jun 06 2023
ORDER RE: PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
GPO Nov 08 2023
ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL granting in part and denying in part 300 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting in part and denying in part 302 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting in part and denying in part 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 325 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting in part and denying in part 336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 340 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting in part and denying in part 342 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/8/2023)
GPO May 03 2024
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 379 Motion for Default Judgment. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/3/2024)
GPO Feb 14 2025
ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS granting in part and denying in part 395 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/14/2025)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
471 471 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 05/09 5:43 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byXiamen 35.com Internet Technology Co., Ltd..(Kronenberger, Karl)
Related: [-] 466 MOTION for Sanctions in the Form of Civil Contempt Remedies
Att: 1 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger,
Att: 2 Declaration Yanrong Li
470 470 motion Bond Fri 05/09 4:34 PM
MOTION for Bond Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 7 filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/23/2025. Replies due by 5/30/2025.(Steele, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Micah G. Block
Monday, May 05, 2025
469 469 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 05/06 9:31 AM
USCA Case Number 25-2886 for the Ninth Circuit for468 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Xiamen 35.com Internet Technology Co., Ltd.. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
468 468 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Fri 05/02 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Xiamen 35.com Internet Technology Co., Ltd.. Appeal of Order on Motion for Sanctions460 (Appeal fee of $605 receipt number ACANDC-20633776 paid.) (Kronenberger, Karl)
Related: [-]