California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:19-cv-09245
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2019
Terminated:Jul 29, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Apr 25, 2020 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Arie Fertig
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Mazal Group LLC
Represented By
Nima Farboody
Mazal Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 03, 2020
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 08/03 11:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 23) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and all dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
24 24 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 07/30 8:38 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 07/29 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/22 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties recent Notice of Settlement (ECF No. 21), the Court hereby ORDERS the parties TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than September 22, 2020, why settlement has not been finalized. No hearing will be held. All other dates and deadlines inthis action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court will discharge this order upon the filing of a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely respond to this order will result in dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
21 21 notice Settlement Tue 07/21 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
20 20 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/08 12:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 7, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's filing of a noticed motion for entry of default judgment for the defendant.The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc) Modified on 7/8/2020 (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Wed 07/08 9:05 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ARIE FERTIG dba D&A DISTRIBUTORS (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
18 18 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 07/07 1:34 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Arie Fertig filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 07/07 1:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC, upon Defendant Arie Fertig served on 3/4/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ARIE FERTIG dba D&A DISTRIBUTORS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
16 16 order Clerk to Enter Default Thu 07/02 9:44 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC seeks an entry of default against Defendant Arie Fertig doingbusiness as D and A Distributors. Related [+] However, Plaintiff served summons with the Artie Fertig and not Arie Fertig doing business as D and A Distributors. Thus, the Artie Fertig was not properly served. See Matthews Metals Prod., Inc. v. RBM Precision Metal Prod., Inc., 186 F.R.D. 581, 582 (N.D. Cal. 1999). The Court cannot enter default. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the request14 . (lc)
Related: [-] quest for Entry of Default, ECF No. 14.
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
15 15 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Wed 07/01 8:54 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Arie Fertig14 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The name of the person served does not exactly match the person named in complaint. Proof of Service is lacking required information. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. 1) Both the Complaint and Summons named the defendant all inclusively as Arie Fertig doing business as D and A Distributors. 2) However, both the proof of service and Request for default are only as to Arie Fertig. 3) Thus Clerk is unable to determine the filings are insufficient and has to refer default to the Judge, and in addition, this request was in response to the Courts Pending Order to Show cause.. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
14 14 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 06/30 1:34 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Arie Fertig filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/19 2:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than June 30, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiffs request for entry of default as to Defendants. Answer by the defendant(s). In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence.The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court'sOrder may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 06/18 2:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC, upon Defendant Arie Fertig served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ARIE FERTIG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Response Thu 06/18 2:49 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,10 (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 06/02 1:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, no later than June 18, 2020, why the Court should not dismiss Plaintiffs claims for failure to serve the Complaint within the Rule 4(m) period. No hearing will be held. The Court will discharge this order upon the filing of a timely proof of service or a demonstration of good cause why timely service has not been made, supported by declaration under penalty of perjury. Failure to timely respond to this Order WILL result in the dismissal of the action without further warning. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 10/31 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions on Mondays, Criminal at 10:00 a.m. and Civil at 1:30 p.m. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/29 4:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Arie Fertig. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/29 4:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/29 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 10/28 1:41 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mazal Group LLC. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/28 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC, (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 10/28 1:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 10/28 1:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. (Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/28 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24681238 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mazal Group LLC. (Attorney Nima Farboody added to party Mazal Group LLC(pty:pla))(Farboody, Nima)
Related: [-]