Aguon et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-03057 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Guam, 1:19-cv-00141 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 26, 2020 6:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Plaintiff
Van W Murer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Aguon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Arceo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Terlaje
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ray Taitague
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lewis Santos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Sablan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Roberto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Quinene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicente Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rudy Paco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benny Baza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David G Cepeda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew R Mesa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Merfalen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James T Linnel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred C Ignacio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Hagen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delfino V Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco C Duenas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Cuasito
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greyorio Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vicente Perez Only (Portal, Janpaul) Refiled correctly in management case, and spread to applicable member case as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions per CMO No 1. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03057-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice Other
Fri 09/25 10:08 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
17 | 17
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alfred C Ignacio, Ray Taitague, Michael Cuasito, Vicente Perez, Johnny Arceo, Edward Terlaje, Raymond Aguon, Michael Roberto, Anthony Quinene, Rudy Paco, Mark Merfalen, Greyorio Cruz, Benny Baza, Delfino V Garcia, James T Linnel, Lewis Santos, Andrew R Mesa, Van W Murer, Francisco C Duenas, William Castro, Randy Sablan, Steve Hagen, David G Cepeda. Service due by 12/29/2020 (Portal, Janpaul) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice Other
Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases . Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s) . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Raymond-Flood on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company FC, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Raymond-Flood, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Martha N Donovan on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company FC, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Donovan, Martha) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice Other
Tue 02/04 1:16 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only . Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice Other
Thu 01/02 2:57 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2: 20 -av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheets need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Counsel may e-file, as an attachment to the complaint or Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Other
Wed 12/18 11:30 AM
NOTICE ADDENDUM TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In addition to counsel preparing and submitting all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov, please include the master MDL docket entry number of the motion filed (and spread to applicable member case(s)) in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG to which the proposed order relates. Please reference within the proposed order in Word document format as well as the subject line of the email to chambers. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Wed 12/18 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE regarding Counsel should prepare and submit all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by David B Dwerlkotte on behalf of E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dwerlkotte, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 10/29 3:21 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Guam, 1:19-cv-00141, Aguon et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-3057-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 6 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 12:30 PM, in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of Guam; Case Number 1:19-cv-00141. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3 Clerk's Notice of Fee due - Filing Fee of $400.00 due by 3:00 p.m. Friday, October 4, 2019. . (fad, ) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.] | |
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015792 re1 Complaint (fad, ) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.] | ||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |