California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:19-cv-09302
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2019
Re-opened:Oct 17, 2024
Terminated:Oct 12, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 26, 2020 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Los Angeles Police Department
Represented By
Ty A Ford
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Chief of Police Michel Moore
Represented By
Ty A Ford
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
Represented By
Ty A Ford
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Officer Gonzalez
Represented By
Ty A Ford
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Officer Meneses
Represented By
Ty A Ford
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard T. Copeland
Represented By
Richard T Copeland
Conflict Solution Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Hasmik Jasmine Chinaryan
Represented By
Matthew Sahak
John Burton Law Offices
contact info
John C Burton
John Burton Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Mariana Manuyan
Represented By
Matthew Sahak
John Burton Law Offices
contact info
John C Burton
John Burton Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
208 208 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Fri 05/16 1:33 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants City of Los Angeles, Fred Cueto, Daniel Gayton, Romero Gonzalez, Mario Menses, Brittany Oke, Eduardo Piche, Brittany Primo, Rodrigo Soria for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Gloria Castillo at Gloria.Castillo@lacity.org with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Ford, Ty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
207 207 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Wed 05/14 3:30 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Hasmik Jasmine Chinaryan, Nare E Chinaryan for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Deirdre Lewis at dl@johnburtonlaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Burton, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
206 206 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 05/13 5:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Court orders the parties to submit additional briefing addressing the following issues: - Would a verdict in favor of Plaintiffs at the second trial conflict, as a matter of law, with the verdict in favor of Defendants at the first trial? If not, how? - If the verdicts conflict, what action can the Court take to remedy the conflict given the Ninth Circuit's mandate affirming the judgment in favor of the City and LAPD? - How should the jury in the second trial be instructed as to the jurys findings in the first trial, if at all? Simultaneous opening briefs are due June 3, 2025. Response briefs are due June 17, 2025. All briefs must comply with Local Rule 11-6, including the word count limitation. After reviewing the briefing, the Court will issue an order on nextsteps. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
205 205 minutes Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form Tue 05/13 10:11 AM
MINUTES of Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine held before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case. For reasons stated on the record, the Court VACATES the Final Pretrial Conference (together with the hearing on the motions in limine) and the Jury Trial to be reset at a later time. The Court will issue an order for additional briefing on the specific issues to be addressed at trial in light of the Ninth Circuit's order. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): John C. Burton and Morgan Ricketts. Attorney for Defendant(s): Ty A. Ford. Courtroom Deputy: Stephen Montes Kerr. Time in Court: 25 mins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (smo) Modified on 5/13/2025 (smo)
Related: [-]